Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1120 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31770 Week
» 130415 Month
» 333079 Year
» 3359932 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4064 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
British Railways |
44064 |
w/e |
26/11/1949 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
w/e |
21/06/1947 |
ALLOC |
12D |
Workington |
w/e |
18/10/1947 |
ALLOC |
8E |
Brunswick |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
ALLOC |
5D |
Stoke |
4w/e |
30/05/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
28/11/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1925 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4064 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Workington (12D) |
|
|
26/11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44064 |
|
|
27/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brunswick (8E) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brunswick (8E) |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
23/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
28/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44064 |
|
|
07/1961 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|