Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1175 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31825 Week
» 130470 Month
» 333134 Year
» 3359987 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4115 |
m/e |
05/1925 |
British Railways |
44115 |
w/e |
20/08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 05/1925 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 10/07/1965 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 2 mths , 10 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1925 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4115 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
20/08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44115 |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Alsager (5E) |
|
|
12/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
09/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
10/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44115 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|