30/11/1949 |
Derby Works |
Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 23003, 40036, 40362, 40471, 485, 40504, 538/43/51/65, 671, 40690, 40910, 917/28, 41005/12/19/53/71/72/90, 1120, 41144, 1153, 41194, 1198, 1420/24, 1531, 1671, 41804, 42314/22/26/31, 2359, 42363, 2408, 42501/06/09/22/33, 3045, 3192/94, 43200, 3204, 43281, 43374, 3427, 3596, 3604/18/78, 3798, 3873, 43933, 3980, 4133/34, 4213/46, 46120, 48223, 10001. New work: On 30/11 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42128-30 were complete, No. 42129 being in the Paint Shop, while on the same day No. 42131 had the frames and cylinders erected and No, 42132 only the frames. New diesels Nos. 12064/65 were complete, while No. 12066 was nearly complete. On 25/11 No. 42326 was being fitted with outside steam pipes. No. 40548 was the first locomotive at Derby Works to receive the crest, being painted black and fully lined; Nos. 41006 an 58068 were the first of their respective classes to be dealt with in the same manner. Further locomotives to be painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40008/69, 40489, 41901, 42519. In addition, the following also carry the crest: Nos, 41754, 43933, 44227/46, 47266, Nos. 58124/79 appeared painted black, with plain tenders. On 30/11 Nos. 40005 an 41090 were ex Works not repainted and still bearing 'L.M.S.' Nos. 456/79, 40740, 41923, 2107, 9546, 9639 an 20216 were cut up during the three W/E 24/12. |
SLS/195001 |
14/07/1951 |
Derby Works |
During the first half of July new 5MT 73000/5/6/7 went back into works for modification to drawgear; others were laid down up to 73012, also frames of diesel 12094. Into shops: 2159 (86G), 40011, 40472, 40508, 40629, 681, 40925, 41044, 41079, 41803/13, 41901, 42141, 42218 (33A), 42323, 42390 (87K), 43235/90, 43631, 43792 (71H), 43987, 44039, 44162, 44467, 44589, 45183 (84G), 47353, 47440/6, 47585, M7603, 47607, 58077, 22951, 64712/55 (39A), 64768 (30A). 40508, 41044 and 58077 were in for special examination. Where sheds are quoted, the locos. are other than L.M.R. stock. In works yard (withdrawn): 1781, 1856, 3617 (58296), 58237, 58302. Stored near station: 40411/6/26, 43312/68, 43469/96, 43574, 58163. Off works: 12015, 40012, 40396, 40402/44/86, 40583, 40935, 41078/87, 42141, 42218, 42317/84, 42411, 42525, 43218, 43331, 43787, 43907/76, 44102/23/34, 44268, 47266, 47357, 47547/89/95, 47611, 53810, 58040, 58300, 64796, 64887. Of these 40583, 42525:43907, 47357 and 53810 are still lettered L.M.S, and 40396 now has tall Stanier chimney in place of previous L.M.S. lipped pattern. |
SLS/195109 |
02/06/1958 |
Derby Works (Yard) |
Paint shop-42310 G, 42424 I, 43709 G, 43855 G, 44585 I, 75016 (G, lined out), D3518 (new no. 16), D3519 (new no. 17). Diesel Erecting shop-10000/1, 12000/66, 15004, D3509, ED4, New Work (Order no. D658)-no. 18 (D3520), no. 19 (D3521), nos. 20-27 (D3522-9) and frames only of no. 28 (D3530) and 33-35 (D3535-7). Erecting shop, no. 1 bay-40396 I, 40691 I, 42514 I, 42608 I, 43900 I, 44249 G, 47004 G, 47319 G, 47324 I, 48082 I, 48412 I, 53809 I, 75046 I, 75047 I, 80036 G, 80048 G, and stripping-42528, 53807 an 58163. Erecting shop, No. 2 Bay-42504 I, 43800 I, 43948 I, 43969 G, 44197 I, 47539 I, 48383 G, 73013 I, and stripping 42528. Yard-40017, 40047 damaged, 40407 cut up, 40680, 41114 cut up, 41804 ex-shops, 42363 ex-shops, 42527, 42541, 43323/575 for cut up, 44010, 44134, 44161, 44176 G, 44597 G, 48532 I and frames only of 47419, 48301/6. |
SLS/195806 |
10/03/1959 |
Derby Works (Erecting shop No 1 bay) |
Paint shop-42396I, 42501I, 44426I, 48010G, 48517G, D5010 new. Diesel erecting shop-10202, 10800, 11127, 12001, 12066, 12088, 13028, 6 0-6-0 DIE shunters (new work), (D3763-8). Erecting shop No 1 bay-40684I, 42409G, 42515G, 43850 G, 44123 I, 44134 I, 44179 G, 47454 G, 47645 G, 47679 I, 48141 I, 48335 G, 73142 I, 73157 I, 75015 I, 75028 G, 75031 G, 75041 G, stripping-42522, 44162, 48621, 80067. Erecting shop No. 2 bay-42374I, 44102 G, 44130 I, 47425 I, 48223(1), 73130 I, 73141 I, stripping-42529, 47526. Erecting shop No. 3 bay-6 Bo-Bo (D5014-19 new) 1160 H.P. D/E, 4 1Co-Col 2300 H.P. D/E Yard-40047/564/680/1000/49/143/57/65, 42354/509/98, 43292/324, 44145/599, 47309, 48194/304/653/699, 10001, 10100, D5009/13 and Cecil Raikes. All stored locos. remain with following additions-47563 (opp. station and not for scrap), 40461, 41121, 43553/946/70, 47426 (opp. m.p.d.). *41000 was noted on 22nd March in the Erecting shop stripped down; also noted on this date in the shops were 40671 an 53807. |
SLS/195904 |
26/04/1964 |
Derby Shed (On Shed) |
On Shed: 45334 x Wok - Cw, D1730, D1732, 12088, 12095, D3022, D4132, D5265 ex works; On Shed: D1735 undercoat, 42161, 42181, 44042, 44134, 44243, 44909, 45002, 45186, 45253, 47320, 47447, 47461, 48199, 48208, 48391, 48490, 48541, 73139, 78057, 90136, 90078, 90357, 90529, 92022, 60876, 68079. |
SLS/196406 |