Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1362 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 32012 Week
» 130657 Month
» 333321 Year
» 3360174 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4155 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
British Railways |
44155 |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 12/1925 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 09/10/1965 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 10 mths , 9 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1925 |
16B |
|
Spital Bridge |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
9G |
|
Northwich |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
2F |
|
Bescot |
w/e |
05/12/1964 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
09/10/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
13/08/1950 |
Inter regional allocations |
The following 44 LMR (16B) locos. were transferred to the Easter Region by virtue of the transfer of Spital Bridge (16B-35C) changing code and region on 13th August, 1950: 40180 3MT, 40401/10/82/97, 40532/58/59 2P, 40934, 41083 4P, 43319, 43651 3F, 43854/63/64, 43957/80/81, 44053/97, 44110/17/52/55, 44218/38/39/73/93/96, 44458/76, 44509/18/19, 4521, 44522 4F, 47269/70, 47566, 47621/22/59 3F, 48074 8MT (? should be 8F). |
SLS/195012 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1925 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4155 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Spital Bridge (16B) |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44155 |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (9G) |
|
|
05/12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44155 |
|
|
11/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|