Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2515 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 28549 Week
» 127194 Month
» 329858 Year
» 3356711 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
16442 |
m/e |
07/1926 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
7359 |
y/e |
1934 |
British Railways |
47359 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1926 |
1C |
|
Watford |
4w/e |
22/06/1946 |
1B |
|
Camden |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
2D |
|
Coventry |
8w/e |
16/07/1955 |
5C |
|
Stafford |
4w/e |
13/08/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
17/07/1965 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2D |
Coventry |
4w/e |
16/07/1955 |
ALLOC |
5C |
Stafford |
4w/e |
13/08/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/07/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 16442 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23438 |
|
|
1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7359 |
|
|
22/06/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Watford (1C) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Camden (1B) |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47359 |
|
|
16/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Coventry (2D) |
|
|
13/08/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford (5C) |
|
|
17/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47359 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|