Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 2637 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33287 Week
» 131932 Month
» 334596 Year
» 3361449 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
16704 |
m/e |
11/1928 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
7621 |
y/e |
1934 |
British Railways |
47621 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
Order Number |
60 |
Works Number |
369 |
To Service |
During 11/1928 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 12/05/1962 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 6 mths , 11 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
16B |
Spital Bridge |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
LOAN |
10C |
Patricroft |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
ALLOC |
10C |
Patricroft |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
ALLOC |
26D |
Bury |
5w/e |
30/04/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
12/05/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 16704 Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 369 |
|
|
1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7621 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47621 |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (16B) |
|
|
21/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (10C) |
|
|
09/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury (26D) |
|
|
12/05/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47621 |
|
|
06/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|