Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 931 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 12146 Week
» 3202 Month
» 349626 Year
» 3376479 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Midland Railway |
2248 |
m/e |
04/1895 |
Midland Railway (1907) |
1855 |
y/e |
1907 |
British Railways |
41855 |
w/e |
01/04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
1121 |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4062 |
To Service |
During 04/1895 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 04/05/1960 |
Service Life |
65 yrs, 1 mth , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
20F |
Skipton |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
ALLOC |
55F |
Manningham |
4w/e |
15/06/1957 |
ALLOC |
91E |
To Eastern Region |
4w/e |
15/06/1957 |
ALLOC |
53E |
Goole |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
04/05/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 1923 |
Rebuilt (no details available) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1895 |
To Service |
To service as Midland Railway Number 2248 Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 4062 |
|
|
1907 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1855 |
|
|
1923 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuilt (no details available) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) |
|
|
27/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Skipton (20F) |
|
|
01/04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 41855 |
|
|
15/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (55F) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (53E) |
|
|
04/05/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 41855 |
|
|
06/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|