|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 25/02/1925 | 23/03/1925 | 27 days | Heavy | Tender number 2217 (Churchward 3,500g) attached. |
65669 | |
Swindon Works | 07/03/1927 | 10/05/1927 | 65 days | Heavy | Boiler number 4603 (Diagram HA) Tender number 1513 (Dean 4,000g) attached. |
139104 | |
Swindon Works | 10/09/1927 | 29/10/1927 | 50 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 07/01/1929 | 23/03/1929 | 76 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2417 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 23/01/1930 | 31/03/1930 | 68 days | Heavy | Boiler number 4659 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2542 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
309331 | |
Swindon Works | 25/06/1931 | 11/09/1931 | 79 days | General | Boiler number 4604 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2244 (Collett 3,500g) attached. |
392525 | |
Swindon Works | 17/02/1932 | 17/03/1932 | 30 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2435 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 12/05/1932 | 10/06/1932 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 27/09/1932 | 01/12/1932 | 66 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2407 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
464863 | |
Swindon Works | 03/04/1933 | 04/1933 | Light Repair | ||||
Swindon Works | 28/11/1933 | 14/02/1934 | 79 days | General | Boiler number 4621 (Diagram HA) |
522135 | |
Swindon Works | 02/04/1935 | 29/05/1935 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 4634 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2540 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
597968 | |
Swindon Works | 28/07/1936 | 20/09/1936 | 55 days | Intermediate | 669928 | ||
Swindon Works | 26/10/1936 | 12/11/1936 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 20/11/1936 | 30/11/1936 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 01/12/1937 | 13/02/1938 | 75 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2624 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 07/04/1938 | 23/06/1938 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 4635 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2590 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
741476 | |
Swindon Works | 11/09/1939 | 01/11/1939 | 52 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2682 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
829372 | |
Swindon Works | 14/05/1941 | 18/07/1941 | 66 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2778 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 17/02/1942 | 15/04/1942 | 58 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2630 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
904382 | |
Swindon Works | 28/02/1943 | 05/02/1944 | 343 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2410 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 21/09/1944 | 06/11/1944 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 6612 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2405 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
986556 | |
Swindon Works | 29/03/1946 | 10/05/1946 | 43 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 26/06/1946 | 06/07/1946 | 11 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2589 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 18/09/1946 | 22/10/1946 | 35 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 6641 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2864 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1056286 | |
Swindon Works | 27/05/1947 | 20/06/1947 | 25 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2603 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 06/02/1948 | 10/03/1948 | 34 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 12/04/1948 | 23/04/1948 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 11/01/1949 | 17/02/1949 | 38 days | Light Casual | Boiler number 6671 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2663 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 01/11/1949 | 08/12/1949 | 38 days | Heavy General | Tender number 2416 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 01/11/1949 | 17/02/1949 | -256 days | Heavy General | 1140799 | ||
Swindon Works | 24/10/1950 | 30/11/1950 | 38 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6624 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4120 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1221307 | |
Swindon Works | 11/08/1952 | 15/09/1952 | 36 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6671 (Diagram HB) |
1306158 | |
Swindon Works | 11/05/1953 | 29/06/1953 | 50 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2658 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 15/02/1954 | 30/03/1954 | 44 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 4624 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2653 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1373850 | |
Swindon Works | 16/05/1955 | 21/06/1955 | 37 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 4608 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2846 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1442193 | |
Swindon Works | 14/05/1956 | 19/09/1956 | 129 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 6647 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2584 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1488699 | |
Swindon Works | 08/10/1957 | 28/11/1957 | 52 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6686 (Diagram HB) |
1545683 | |
Swindon Works | 31/07/1959 | 29/09/1959 | 61 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6681 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2559 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1632489 | |
Swindon Works | 25/08/1961 | 20/10/1961 | 57 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6672 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2390 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1720523 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1946 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during March: 111, 1010, 2026/55, 2103, 2204/12/54, 2816/39/46/9, 2924/39/48/79, 3010/5/20, 3171, 3446, 3632, 3715/93 3855, 4012/33/5/55/79/82, 4136, 4365, 4565/70 4702, 4830/67, 4917/37/58/84/5, 5004/8/49/71/90, 5153/86/93, 5310/38/84/97, 5420, 5505/31/53, 5787,-5967/99, 6000/17/25/8, 6114/21/50/1, 6365/74/86/8 6417, 6916/8/41, 7312, 7713/32, 7802/10, 9721/60/3/80/7/90/6. Nameplates have been affixed to 1000/17-9, 6916/32/38/46/67. With the completion of 1019, there is a temporary halt in the programme of construction of '1000' Class locomotives and work is under way on new 'Castle' and 'Hall' Class locomotives. | SLS/194606 |
31/05/1947 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering Works during May included: 111, 1336, 1716, 1796, 2046, 2061, 2266, 2458, 2651, 2777, 2780, 2827, 2834, 2870, 2924, 2987, 3032, 3044, 3046, 3341, 3364, 3382, 3625, 3711, 3837, 3855, 4079, 4083, 4086, 4297, 4706, 4901, 4921, 4943, 4974, 4976, 4994, 4996, 5005, 5007,, 5029, 5044, 5050, 5092, 5322, 5326, 5392, 5937, 5963, 6117, 6342, 6383, 6906, 6929, 6955, 6964, 6969, 7210 and 9755. | SLS/194708 |
29/02/1948 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during February included:- Nos. 1013-15 1943, 1995, 2903, 2933, 2945, 2955, 3004, 3816, 3863, 4020, 4043, 4079, 4098, 4904, 4939, 4944, 4956, 5018, 5035, 5053, 5062, 5090, 5324, 5337, 5381, 5927, 5953, 5982, 6015, 6020, 6025, 6366, 6866, 6934, 6956, 7002, 7212, 7214, 7300, W.D. 77027, 77184, 79279, 79301 an 79309. Further locomotives ex works with prefix W and plain tanks or tenders included Nos. 823, 1433, 1441, 2288, 2951, while No. 6000 has the prefix and 'British Railways' on the tender | SLS/194804 |
31/01/1949 | Swindon Works | New Work January: Nos. 6996 Blackwell Hall (RDG (4/1)), 6997 Bryn-Ivor Hall (17/1), 6998 Burton Agnes Hall (28/1); 6769 BRY (6/1). Locomotives entering Works 30/12/48 to 28/1/49: These included Nos. p24 (Petrol), 213/46 (Both acting as Works' pilots), 1007/08/19, 1369, 1426/29, 2016 (open cab), 2235/64/94, 2445, 2807/59, 2843, 2942/79/87, 3020/44, 3631/33, 3751, 3811/57 (damaged), 3818/28/55, 4017/41/46/53/59/74/78/79/86, 4122/37, 4225/82,, 4507/10/50/94, 4601, 4801 (Ex-Carriage Stock Shed-for conversion to coal-burning), 4912/15/21/35/58, 5014/27/29/49/57/61/92/93, 5108/34, 5225, 5307/33/48/58, 5502/05/12/31/53/72, 5909/49/61/97 , 6013/23/29, 6104/38/58/66, 6304/07/32/34/59/81, 6432, 6640, 6802/03/64/65/69, 6967, 7412, 7731/62/66/86/87, 7805, 8724/26, 9604/11/53, 9732/53/69, W.D. 77049 (badly damaged), 79279, 79309. Condemned: Nos. *1538, *1713, 2717 (all to Concentration Yard), 1889/97, 2767 (open cab), 2935, 3049, 3446/48, 4320. *After acting as Works' pilot. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, include Nos. 4900, 5997, 6930/39, while No. 2166 came out black and unlined-with the original boiler again. No. 3020 has had a heavy repair (with a change of boiler), fitted with a smokebox numberplate, but not re-painted |
SLS/194903 |
17/09/1961 | Swindon Works ('A' Shop) | 'A' Shop: D604, D816/7/21/3/5/43/70, D3431, D6306/8/21, 2866, 3852, 4003/79/81/7/9, D1000-11, D2379-83, 4117, 4707, 4904/26/33/43/66/79/92/8, 5018/38/74/92, 5208, 5380, 6021/6, 6808/16/25/32/4/40, 6948, 7018/28, 7219, 7825, 7905/21, 13115/84/6, 13259/65, 92215/26. Works Sidings: D820, D2086, D2143/4, D2378, D7000, 1009, 3670, 3839/59, 4100, 4917/8/83, 5000/78, 5951/98, 6014/6/9/27, 6964/87/96, 7200, 7756/75, 7909, 8721, 9400, 9749, 73027, 78008, 92241/5. Triangle: 1640, 5087, 5198, 5516, 5934/75, 8762/72/87, 9751, 13355. Dump: 1361/6, 1433, 1604, 5318, 6720, 7745/98, 8429, 8740/74/7/89, 9735/6/67. 'C' Shop: 4203, 5110/95. Outside Stock Shed: D806, D4025, D6303, 4948, 5815, 6900. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: D801. Gasworks : Nil. | SLS/196111 |
18/08/1963 | Swindon Works (In store on shed) | Triangle: 1432, 6437, 5679, 8444/86/91/94/96, 8766, 9401/79/83, 9715, D3103. Yard: 1621, 3668, 3711, 3826, 4082, 4175, 4265/98, 5645, 5933, 6011/25/26, 6159, 6815/19/28/35, 6931/32/61/78, 7909, 8738, 9412/40. 'A' Shop: D1023-26 (New in various stages of construction), D603, D801/4/40/61/2, D1004/9/16/9/50/63, D6305, D7075, 3605, 3738, 3850, 4115/57/68, 5971, 6000/18, 6129/65, 6809/15/37/68, 6937/44/78/94, 7902/27, 8403, 9662, 92246, Birmingham Pullman, uW60096. Top end of 'A' Shop: 15100/1/3, D3509/94/95, D3195, D3600, and N.C.B. 0-6-2 T. 67 (ex T.V.R.). Dismantling Shed: 5644, 5945. Dump: 3795, 4074, 5101/92, 5201, 5912/31, 7;412, 8783/91, 9713. Weigh House: D604, D808, 3823. On shed ex-Works: 9607, 9666. In store on shed: 1019, 2250, 2890, 3780, 3842, 4079, 4631, 4909, 4948, 5017, 5357, 5525/70, 5815, 5943, 9604 an W21. | SLS/196309 |
14/02/1965 | Swindon Works (Erecting shop) | Erecting shop: D9532-46, 4079, D603, D800/1/25/53/66, D1019/34/48/69, D1746, D2238, D3105/96, D3260/8, D3355, D3604, D3750, D3947/80, D4016, PWM650. Weigh shop area: D807, D1017/38, D827, D4213, D6326/30, D7061. Dump: 2818, 3700/25, 3807/35, 5936/74, 6125, 6860, 6935. Triangle: 73093. Turntable area: 3253, 4659, 8405/9, 9425/57, 43003 ex Works. | SLS/196503 |
16/09/1967 | Great Western Society\'s Open Day at Taplow | On 16th September both 3205 and 4079 were in steam. Former came under its own steam from Bridgnorth and latter from Didcot. 3205 attracted much attention on its return journey over the former O.W.W. line to Worcester (for Bridgnorth). | SLS/196710 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1924 | Tender | Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g number 2227 | ||
04/03/1924 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 4079, name: PENDENNIS CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) Diagram HA boiler fitted |
||
25/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 25/02/1925. Dep: 23/03/1925. Work undertaken: Tender number 2217 (Churchward 3,500g) attached. |
||
17/05/1925 | Allocation | |||
13/04/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (LA) | ||
25/06/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) | ||
11/1926 | Tender | Tender fitted: Dean 4,000g number 1457 | ||
07/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 07/03/1927. Dep: 10/05/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4603 (Diagram HA) Tender number 1513 (Dean 4,000g) attached. |
||
10/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/09/1927. Dep: 29/10/1927. | ||
07/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/01/1929. Dep: 23/03/1929. Work undertaken: Tender number 2417 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
23/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 23/01/1930. Dep: 31/03/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4659 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2542 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
25/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1931. Dep: 11/09/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4604 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2244 (Collett 3,500g) attached. |
||
11/09/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD) | ||
02/02/1932 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2537 | ||
17/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/02/1932. Dep: 17/03/1932. Work undertaken: Tender number 2435 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
12/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/05/1932. Dep: 10/06/1932. | ||
27/09/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 27/09/1932. Dep: 01/12/1932. Work undertaken: Tender number 2407 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
01/12/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD) | ||
03/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/04/1933. Dep: ?/04/1933. | ||
28/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1933. Dep: 14/02/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4621 (Diagram HA) |
||
12/01/1935 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 3,500g number 2260 | ||
02/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1935. Dep: 29/05/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4634 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2540 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
14/12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) | ||
08/04/1936 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2569 | ||
28/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 28/07/1936. Dep: 20/09/1936. | ||
26/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/10/1936. Dep: 12/11/1936. | ||
20/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/11/1936. Dep: 30/11/1936. | ||
05/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) | ||
06/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) | ||
01/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/12/1937. Dep: 13/02/1938. Work undertaken: Tender number 2624 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
07/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1938. Dep: 23/06/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4635 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2590 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
11/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 11/09/1939. Dep: 01/11/1939. Work undertaken: Tender number 2682 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
01/11/1939 | Allocation | |||
14/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/05/1941. Dep: 18/07/1941. Work undertaken: Tender number 2778 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
17/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 17/02/1942. Dep: 15/04/1942. Work undertaken: Tender number 2630 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
28/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/02/1943. Dep: 05/02/1944. Work undertaken: Tender number 2410 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
06/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hereford (HFD) | ||
21/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1944. Dep: 06/11/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6612 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2405 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
11/04/1945 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2895 | ||
29/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/03/1946. Dep: 10/05/1946. | ||
26/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/06/1946. Dep: 06/07/1946. Work undertaken: Tender number 2589 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
18/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 18/09/1946. Dep: 22/10/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6641 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2864 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
27/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/05/1947. Dep: 20/06/1947. Work undertaken: Tender number 2603 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Hereford (HFD) | ||
06/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/02/1948. Dep: 10/03/1948. | ||
12/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/04/1948. Dep: 23/04/1948. | ||
03/11/1948 | Allocation | |||
27/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (GLO) | ||
11/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/01/1949. Dep: 17/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6671 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2663 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
01/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 01/11/1949. Dep: 08/12/1949. Work undertaken: Tender number 2416 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
01/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 01/11/1949. Dep: 17/02/1949. | ||
23/01/1950 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2908 | ||
24/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 24/10/1950. Dep: 30/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6624 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4120 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
31/03/1951 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2910 | ||
11/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 11/08/1952. Dep: 15/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6671 (Diagram HB) |
||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A) | ||
11/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/05/1953. Dep: 29/06/1953. Work undertaken: Tender number 2658 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
29/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A) | ||
15/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/02/1954. Dep: 30/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4624 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2653 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
16/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/05/1955. Dep: 21/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4608 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2846 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
14/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 14/05/1956. Dep: 19/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6647 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2584 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
13/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) | ||
08/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 08/10/1957. Dep: 28/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6686 (Diagram HB) |
||
31/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 31/07/1959. Dep: 29/09/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6681 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2559 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
13/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Taunton (83B) | ||
18/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) | ||
25/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/08/1961. Dep: 20/10/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6672 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2390 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
14/03/1962 | To Store | To Store | ||
11/08/1962 | Reinstated | Reinstated to Swindon (82C) | ||
30/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) | ||
08/05/1964 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2913 | ||
14/05/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 4079 from St Philips Marsh (82B) |