Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 37 Online
» 4537 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 35187 Week
» 133832 Month
» 336496 Year
» 3363349 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1614 |
m/e |
03/1918 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9291 |
m/e |
03/1926 |
British Railways |
49291 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
G1 |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 03/1918 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 20/05/1950 |
Service Life |
32 yrs, 2 mths , 21 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1918 |
6B |
|
Mold Junction |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
5C |
|
Stafford |
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
20/05/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
6B |
Mold Junction |
w/e |
23/08/1947 |
ALLOC |
5C |
Stafford |
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
20/05/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1918 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1614 |
|
|
03/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9291 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49291 |
|
|
05/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford (5C) |
|
|
20/05/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49291 |
|
|