Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 35 Online
» 1287 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31937 Week
» 130582 Month
» 333246 Year
» 3360099 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Orig) |
13123 |
on |
01/10/1929 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
2823 |
|
07/08/1935 |
British Railways |
42823 |
|
10/07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Hughes |
Class |
CRAB |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
87 |
To Service |
Sat 01/10/1929 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 22/02/1964 |
Service Life |
34 yrs, 4 mths , 21 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
01/10/1929 |
16A |
|
Nottingham |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
21A |
|
Saltley |
4w/e |
28/01/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
22/02/1964 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
21A |
Saltley |
4w/e |
28/01/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
22/02/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1962 |
Saltley MPD |
42053, 42284, 42707/84/90/823/7/900 are in store whilst 92167 (mechanical stoker) has been returned from the N.E.R.; on 20th October, 42791 (9G) was rostered to the Redditch-Alcester goods. |
SLS/196212 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/10/1929 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13123 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
07/08/1935 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2823 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
10/07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42823 |
|
|
28/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
22/02/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42823 |
|
|
09/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|