Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 36 Online
» 1314 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31964 Week
» 130609 Month
» 333273 Year
» 3360126 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2645 |
on |
02/12/1938 |
British Railways |
42645 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 02/12/1938 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 11/09/1965 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 9 mths , 9 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/11/1959 |
Landore MPD |
With four Fowler 2-6-4Ts in Derby Works, three Stanier 2-6-4Ts have had to be borrowed for the Central Wales LNW line viz. 42296, 42645/51 from Agecroft. At Swansea East Dock, 1641/52 an 6763 have been placed in store while at Danygraig six displaced Panthers have been transferred to the S.R. at Exmouth Junc. viz. 3633/79, 4666/81/94. |
SLS/196001 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/12/1938 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2645 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Agecroft (26B) |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42645 |
|
|
28/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
25/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Agecroft (26B) |
|
|
02/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southport (27C) |
|
|
11/09/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42645 |
|
|
11/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|