19/04/1948 |
On loan to S.R. |
New 2-6-4T's Nos. 42198 an 42199 began comprehensive trials on the S.R. on April 19th. Specials were worked from Waterloo to Basingstoke, also Victoria to Tunbridge Wells West, and back. Workings were then arranged on ordinary trains based on Nine Elms, Stewarts Lane, Bricklayers' Arms, Ashford, Tunbridge Wells and Dover sheds in turn, with particular attention to the Oxted lines of the Central Section. On 24/4 No. 42199 worked a special from Victoria-Ashford and on the return journey, running bunker first, was observed at over 80 miles per hour near Staplehurst, while No. 42198 on a trial trip with 7 bogies (empty) ran non-stop Waterloo-Basingstoke in 46 minutes. |
SLS/194806 |
19/04/1948 |
On loan to S.R. |
New 2-6-4T's Nos. 42198 an 42199 began comprehensive trials on the S.R. on April 19th. Specials were worked from Waterloo to Basingstoke, also Victoria to Tunbridge Wells West, and back. Workings were then arranged on ordinary trains based on Nine Elms, Stewarts Lane, Bricklayers' Arms, Ashford, Tunbridge Wells and Dover sheds in turn, with particular attention to the Oxted lines of the Central Section. On 24/4 No. 42199 worked a special from Victoria-Ashford and on the return journey, running bunker first, was observed at over 80 miles per hour near Staplehurst, while No. 42198 on a trial trip with 7 bogies (empty) ran non-stop Waterloo-Basingstoke in 46 minutes. |
SLS/194806 |
29/06/1948 |
Stirling MPD |
2-6-4T's Nos. 42198/99 arrived here on Tuesday night (29/6), after trials on the former Southern Rly. 'West Country' No. 34004 with black ex L.M.S. tender and lettered BR., was observed here on 3/7 at 5 p.m. on the 9.25 a.m. ex Crewe en route to Perth, being piloted by ex L.M.S. No. 4980. |
SLS/194808 |
31/12/1949 |
Kilmarnock Works |
Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 626, 40642, 40919, 1171, 2191, 42198, 42905, 4001, 54446, 17470, 57569, 57640. |
SLS/195002 |
19/09/1961 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D99, D211, D2503, D2908, D5023/88, D5144, D8014, 11146, 13248. Diesel Test House: D1, D48, D90, D2913, D5075. New Building: D46, D139-D147. Finishing Shop: D21/2, D49, D93, D138, D8015. Erecting Shop: 12096, 13122/76, 41804, 42198, 42211, 42408, 43599, 43645, 43964, 44572, 47207, 47272, 47308/27, 47450/94, 47602/29, 48225/79, 53809, 73010/38/71, 73125/30, 75018/32. Paint Shop: D47, D100 (re-varnished and named Sherwood Forester). In Works Sidings: Cecil Raikes, D44, D2501, D2909, 10202/3, 12000, 41168, 42282, 42283, 42328/49/74, 42510/21/4/31, 43905, 47268, 47432, 47611, 48001, 58850, 75017/34. |
SLS/196110 |
16/10/1961 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D6, D211, D312, D2908/9/13, D5084/9, 10203, 11146. Diesel Test House: D3, D138/9, D226, 11145, 12100. Shunter Test House: 12096. New Building: D142-D151. Finishing Shop: D76, D140/1, D5024, D8000. Erecting Shop: D3578, 12078, 13122/3, 42198, 42368, 42421, 44172/8, 44213/94, 44436, 47250, 47350/88/99, 48001/53/7, 48356, 48439, 58850 frames only, 73073, 73137/59, 75015/30/5. Paint Shop: 42408, 44185, 48491, 73010. In Works Sidings: ED3, D1, D10, D43, D75, D89, D2501, D5143, 10202, 12000/54, 41168, 41804, 42328, 42404, 42510/21/4, 43295, 43593, 43905, 44033, 44232/48, 47218/68/98, 47529, 47666, 48009/10, 48185, 48380, 73158, 75017, 92059. |
SLS/196111 |
16/03/1962 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D2, D110, D115, D122, D5018/35/75/6/80/6. Test House: D1, D3, D38, D75, D103, D161, D2213. New Building: D164-D173. Finishing Shop: D162/3, D5081/2/9. Erecting Shop: L. & N.W.R. 2650, D3124, 13117, 42089, 42198, 42343/50/85, 43453, 43950/85, 44092, 44262, 47003, 47165, 47336, 47427, 47627/67/74, 48182, 48211, 75035. Paint Shop: D160, 47643, 48490. Works Sidings: ED1, ED3, D123, D2506/8, D2912, D5022/92, D5133, 12000, 41168, 42332/56/63/75/87, 42448, 43410, 47218/59, 47601, 48099, 48442, 58228. Works Shunters: D2380, 47000, 47250. |
SLS/196204 |