Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 1042 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31692 Week
» 130337 Month
» 333001 Year
» 3359854 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5272 |
m/e |
11/1936 |
British Railways |
45272 |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1327 |
To Service |
During 11/1936 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 09/10/1965 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 11 mths , 8 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5272 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1327 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bristol Barrow Road (22A) |
|
|
24/04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45272 |
|
|
09/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
28/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) |
|
|
04/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (19B) |
|
|
11/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (19B) |
|
|
01/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
04/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
18/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D) |
|
|
20/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
18/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
07/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
03/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (2B) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45272 |
|
|
01/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|