27/08/1949 |
St. Rollox Works |
Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 579/97, 600, 40901/05, 41142, 42745, 2806/81, 43849, 4009, 4255. 4879, 5012, 45081, 45115/20/53/57/62/63/71/73/78/79, 45359, 45455/58/60/68/86/87, 45560/79/83, 45645, 45729/31, 46107, 54446/58/92/96, 15167, 55187, 15194, 55197, 15200, 16360/66, 17356, 17407, 57465, 17585, 17621. |
SLS/194910 |
30/11/1949 |
St. Rollox Works |
Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 40170, 40651/63, 687, 40907/09, 912/22, 1129/34, 41177, 1182, 2691, 42699, 2736, 42749, 2880, 42927, 44699, 44900, 4956, 44959/75, 45029/49, 45117/23/52/72, 45251, 45356/62/63, 45463/64/74/85/90, 45575/79, 45728, 7332, 47540, 14450, 14500/01, 55200, 15203/29, 16152, 56170, 16318, 56320, 16328/34, 17270, 57312, 17437, 17593, 17642. On 12/11, No. 54472, the first ex C.R. locomotive to bear the crest was ex Works. |
SLS/195001 |
31/12/1949 |
St. Rollox Works |
Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 40150, 1110, 42163, 2801, 42808/36, 44318, 44700/97, 44958/72, 45036/47, 45122/27/51/58/63/69, 45364/66, 45461/70/89, 45579, 45644/92, 45715, 47163, 14507, 55161, 15199, 15218, 55233, 15361, 56025. 16166, 56239, 16285/92, 16316. 56336/69, 17242, 57340, 17354/84, 57599, 17672. No. 45575 is to be the first locomotive painted in the new green livery at St. Rollox. It will be noticed that the Works' shunter-No. 56025- is under repair, which is being replaced temporarily by No. 16035, which is on loan. |
SLS/195002 |
31/01/1950 |
St. Rollox Works |
Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 1179, 42203, 2207, 42793, 42876, 42918, 4901, 44957/60, 4961/69, 44999, 45155/73/4/5/94, 45320/55, 45443/84, 45583, 14493, 15172, 55238, 56254, 16274, 16333/64/71, 17276, 57292, 57361, 57417, 17550/79, 17682. No. 45575 was turned out on 14/1 in the new green livery-the first locomotive to be painted here in colours since the war. The 'Great Western' effect was enhanced by the fact that it has a domeless boiler. The St. Rollox tradition of having numbering of a different size to other works is retained, the numbers being of the larger size, as on the black locomotives painted here. The front numberplate and shedplate were at one time painted red, but were blacked over before completion. Nos. 54507 an 55199 following No. 45575 from the Paint Shop, have both had the background of their numberplates painted red. Another of the few remaining 'Jubilee's' with domeless boilers-No. 45579-is also in the Works, The Works' shunter-No. 56025-has been the object of a commendable piece of enterprise. On completion of its overhaul it has been beautifully repainted with full lining-even the front of the cab being lined-with crests of the smaller type on the saddle tanks. |
SLS/195003 |
03/06/1961 |
Leeds-Birmingham-Bristol line |
With the advent of the Summer t.t. several steam workings have gone over to Type 4 Sulzers; whilst only 3 A3 Pacifics are left at Holbeck, Saltley has gained 3 class 6P and 11 Class 7P 4-6-0s viz., 45579, 45648/9, 45532/40, 46100/3/12/8/22/41/57/60/2. It is presumed that these latter will be utilised on Saturdays for the many extra trains which are run (and upon which 2-10-0s were utilised last year). |
SLS/196107 |
25/11/1961 |
Burton MPD |
Eighteen Jubilees were transferred here on 25th November in exchange for Class 4Fs, although it is believed all are to be stored viz. 45557/79/85/98, 45610/1/2/5/8/20/6/36/41/8/9/50/67/8. |
SLS/196201 |
04/03/1963 |
GC line (Leicester shed) |
Since the withdrawal of the local services from 4th March, Annesley shed now works the remaining semi-fast services (Nottingham-London) using Class 5s and Royal Scots. Woodford shed now has no passenger workings and its stud of ex LMR 2-6-4Ts (from Neasden) have been placed in store. Leicester shed has not been closed but its allocation has been reduced; on 16th March the following were on shed-42437/53/6, 44690, 45238, 45579, 48079; 46112, 60961 an 61374. Only latter was in steam. Leicester Central will be used during the summer for the former Belgrave Road station trains to Mablethorpe and Skegness (which ran on Saturdays and Sundays only). |
SLS/196304 |
28/02/1963 |
March MPD (Leicester shed) |
Britannias 70000/1/2/3/5/6-13 were all placed in store at March in February due to further dieselisation by Type 3 diesels from Darnall and these now cover several March freight turns; three of the Britannias are understood to be unserviceable due to frost damage. On 30th March 70000/1/5/10/2 were transferred to Willesden leaving the others stored at the time. On 13th April, a visit to the shed revealed 70008/11/3 in steam acting as spare engines for diesel failures. J17 65541, which was stationary boiler here, has now been replaced by B1 61378. A new diesel depot is being built at March alongside the old repair shops and a further diesel depot is now under construction at Kings Lynn where 7 Brush and 6 small diesels are stationed. Several Brush diesels are now stabled in the old steam shed at Cambridge and 2 Brush diesels and one 204 h.p. stable at Ely. |
SLS/196304 |
16/04/1963 |
Malton MPD (Leicester shed) |
The closure of Malton shed, recently forecast, as being likely to take place this summer, actually occurred officially on and from 16th April. All Malton’s steam locos. had however left during the preceding week, and on the official day of closure, the only steam loco. at the shed was 43055 (50A), on temporary standby. The two diesel shunters are now stabled overnight on a carriage siding under that part of the station roof which covers the Whitby bay platform. Since closure of Malton shed, local goods workings between York and Malton have been covered by 2-6-Os of 43XXX and 77XXX series; one of the latter type (including 77004 still with snowplough) brings the early morning goods from York and continues with the pick-up freight to Whitby, where it is remanned. The diesel shunters have been working the thrice-weekly trip on the Gilling branch, which is now disconnected at the Pilmoor end. The Ampleforth College Special from London to Gilling on 30th April, was worked from KX to Malton by A4 60017 Silver Fox and was replaced by 2-6-0 77004 still fitted with its small snowplough. Y7 0-4-0 ex-L.N.E.R. 985 is lying derelict at Bentinck Colliery (nr. Kirkby in Ashfield) and appears to have been out of use for some time. |
SLS/196304 |