Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2527 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33177 Week
» 131822 Month
» 334486 Year
» 3361339 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4907 |
m/e |
01/1929 |
Great Western Railway (Oil Burner) |
3903 |
m/e |
05/1947 |
Great Western Railway (Ex-Oil) |
4907 |
m/e |
04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
Hall |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
254 |
To Service |
During 01/1929 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 01/08/1963 |
Service Life |
34 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1929 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4907, name: BROUGHTON HALL Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
05/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3903 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Old Oak Common (PDN) |
|
|
04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4907 |
|
|
22/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
20/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (82F) |
|
|
31/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (82F) |
|
|
21/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
05/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hereford (85C) |
|
|
26/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
21/05/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxford (81F) |
|
|
22/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
28/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
21/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hereford (86C) |
|
|
01/08/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4907 |
|
|
01/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|