|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 24/02/1949 | 10/03/1949 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/10/1949 | 03/11/1949 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/12/1949 | 03/01/1950 | 28 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/05/1950 | 16/06/1950 | 47 days | General | Named OSPREY |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/09/1950 | 12/10/1950 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/08/1951 | 28/09/1951 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/10/1952 | 13/11/1952 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 10595 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/02/1953 | 15/02/1953 | 7 days | Unclassified | ATC fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/04/1954 | 02/06/1954 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 10591 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/04/1955 | 13/04/1955 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/09/1955 | 28/09/1955 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/03/1956 | 03/05/1956 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/07/1957 | 19/07/1957 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/08/1957 | 15/08/1957 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/08/1957 | 30/08/1957 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/09/1957 | 27/09/1957 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/02/1958 | 19/03/1958 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29808 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/10/1959 | 27/11/1959 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29779 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/10/1960 | 21/10/1960 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/07/1962 | 17/11/1962 | 114 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 15/12/1964 | 08/01/1965 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 29/01/1965 | 08/03/1965 | 39 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/11/1948 | Darlington Works | The new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60130-33, ex North Road bear Works Nos. 2049-52, in order. A minor change will be noticed in the new Darlington and Doncaster Works plates on the new 'A.1's,' they give the date, Works No. and origin, but no area is given. No. 68051 has been fitted with a modified bunker (and new cab windows), for increased coal capacity. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 827, 1601/29/30/42/51/55/72, 2992 (to scrap yard), 3007, 3344, 4916, 5710, 7307, 8089, 8400, 8686, 9099, 9392, 69841, 'Austerity' 77329 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60507, 60980. 62366, 62711/23/75, 63398, 65028, 65118, 65752/85, 65803/83, 67256/65, 68051, 68395, 68437, 68533, 68675, 69372/92, 69787, 69882/91/93 and- 'Austerity' 77215. Locomotives broken up:-Nos. 1360/78, 5641, 8285, 8400 an 9399. It will be noticed that two of these were ex G.C.R. 'B.7' 4-6-0's. It is pleasing to note that the N.E. Area locomotives. especially Gateshead stock, are approaching their pre-grouping splendour for cleanliness. Some of the 'A.4's' are spotless, while the rest are creditable. |
SLS/194812 |
30/06/1950 | Recently named engines | Engines recently named include 60121 Silurian, 60131 Osprey, 60137 Redgauntlet, 60139 Sea Eagle. | SLS/195008 |
27/12/1952 | North Eastern Miscellany | Darlington: No. 76020 is working from Bank Top Shed, and we hear that 76021/2 are at Hull. No. 76023 worked an up goods arriving Darlington 2.30 p.m. and returned north at 4 p.m. on 12th January. It is proposed to try 76020 on a two-trip Saltburn passenger job when run in. Nos. 78001/2 worked the 8.25 p.m. Darlington-Kirkby goods one day (or night!) last week, but both were shy steamers and broke no records climbing Stainmore. The Royal train, last Saturday, was worked by 'A.1' No. 60131 Osprey, and No. 60075 St. Frusquin stood pilot at Bank Top, cleaned up in the old N.E.R. tradition. No. 65103 ('J.21') is running two trips, Darlington-Penrith, daily with the Bank Top passenger turns, quite a nice mileage for this loco., but she is kept in excellent fettle. Another consistent performer here is No. 61353, the Rugby Plant 'B.1.' She is regularly on a Darlington-Newcastle-Leeds-Darlington job, double manned. | SLS/195303 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/10/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60131 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2050 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
24/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/02/1949. Dep: 10/03/1949. | ||
24/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/10/1949. Dep: 03/11/1949. | ||
07/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/12/1949. Dep: 03/01/1950. | ||
01/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1950. Dep: 16/06/1950. Work undertaken: Named OSPREY |
||
16/06/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
25/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/09/1950. Dep: 12/10/1950. | ||
21/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 21/08/1951. Dep: 28/09/1951. | ||
09/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
15/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
13/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1952. Dep: 13/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10595 (Diagram 118) |
||
09/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/02/1953. Dep: 15/02/1953. Work undertaken: ATC fitted |
||
15/02/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
29/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1954. Dep: 02/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10591 (Diagram 118) |
||
13/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/04/1955. Dep: 13/04/1955. | ||
16/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/09/1955. Dep: 28/09/1955. | ||
22/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1956. Dep: 03/05/1956. | ||
08/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/07/1957. Dep: 19/07/1957. | ||
12/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/08/1957. Dep: 15/08/1957. | ||
26/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/08/1957. Dep: 30/08/1957. | ||
23/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/09/1957. Dep: 27/09/1957. | ||
18/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1958. Dep: 19/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29808 (Diagram 118) |
||
26/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1959. Dep: 27/11/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29779 (Diagram 117) |
||
13/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/10/1960. Dep: 21/10/1960. | ||
01/04/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
27/07/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1962. Dep: 17/11/1962. | ||
28/07/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) | ||
15/12/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/12/1964. Dep: 08/01/1965. | ||
29/01/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/01/1965. Dep: 08/03/1965. | ||
04/10/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60131 from Neville Hill (55H) |