|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 31/03/1947 | 23/04/1947 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 07/12/1947 | 16/01/1948 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 3619 (Diagram 100A) Front end heater connection fitted |
||
Stratford Works | 01/04/1949 | 04/06/1949 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 9863 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61055 |
||
Stratford Works | 09/07/1949 | 23/07/1949 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 24/11/1949 | 02/12/1949 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 26/03/1950 | 12/05/1950 | 48 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 19/02/1951 | 07/04/1951 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 28538 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 19/08/1952 | 22/08/1952 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 24/11/1952 | 10/01/1953 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 28594 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Stratford Works | 26/05/1953 | 24/07/1953 | 60 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 22/11/1954 | 01/01/1955 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 28145 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 05/09/1955 | 29/09/1955 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 11/12/1955 | 25/01/1957 | 412 days | General | Boiler number 10812 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 15/09/1958 | 24/10/1958 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28835 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 04/11/1958 | 05/11/1958 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/07/1960 | 15/07/1960 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/07/1961 | 03/08/1961 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28579 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/07/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2395/6, E3064-9, 13253. Boiler Shop: E3071/2. Stripping Road: D2235, 60044/56/63/94, 60502, 61088, 61803, 61902, 73043. Scrap Road: 61824, 61927/64, 64736, 69531 intact, 68951 just cut up. Crimpsal: 60150, 61204. Outside Crimpsal: 60147, 62015, 70034. Erecting Shop: D3446/9, D3660, D5560/72, D8212, 12124, 60022/30, 60155, 60519, 61055, 61157/95, 61208, 61312/26, 61846, 70009/18/38/9, 76050. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60034. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 60029, 61906. Paint Shop: D2234, D2394, D5571, D6722, E3063, 60009/73, 61056, 61378, 61893. Outside Paint Shop: D353, D5806, D9008. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196109 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/07/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1055 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25811 Allocated to Ipswich (IPS) |
||
31/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/03/1947. Dep: 23/04/1947. | ||
07/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1947. Dep: 16/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3619 (Diagram 100A) Front end heater connection fitted |
||
01/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1949. Dep: 04/06/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9863 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61055 |
||
09/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/07/1949. Dep: 23/07/1949. | ||
24/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/11/1949. Dep: 02/12/1949. | ||
26/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/03/1950. Dep: 12/05/1950. | ||
19/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1951. Dep: 07/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28538 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/08/1952. Dep: 22/08/1952. | ||
24/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1952. Dep: 10/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28594 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
26/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/05/1953. Dep: 24/07/1953. | ||
22/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1954. Dep: 01/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28145 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/09/1955. Dep: 29/09/1955. | ||
11/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1955. Dep: 25/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10812 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1958. Dep: 24/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28835 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/11/1958. Dep: 05/11/1958. | ||
08/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
04/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/07/1960. Dep: 15/07/1960. | ||
06/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1961. Dep: 03/08/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28579 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
13/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
27/02/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61055 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
04/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton |