|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 29/03/1949 | 28/04/1949 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 9896 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61257 |
||
Darlington Works | 04/09/1950 | 30/09/1950 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 9895 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/04/1952 | 25/04/1952 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28203 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/08/1953 | 19/09/1953 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28219 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/09/1953 | 01/10/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/10/1953 | 08/10/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/05/1954 | 02/06/1954 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 15/06/1954 | 22/06/1954 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 14/04/1955 | 12/05/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28547 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/11/1956 | 30/11/1956 | 24 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 04/12/1956 | 05/12/1956 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/12/1956 | 18/12/1956 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/01/1957 | 22/02/1957 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 09/12/1958 | 13/01/1959 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28407 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 28/01/1959 | 02/02/1959 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/08/1959 | 18/08/1959 | 13 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 12/02/1960 | 03/03/1960 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 04/09/1961 | 05/10/1961 | 32 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 16/10/1961 | 27/10/1961 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/11/1961 | 24/11/1961 | 23 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1947 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1253 (10/11), 1254 (12/11), 1255 (14/11), 1256 (17/11), 1257 (19/11), 1258 (21/11), 1259 (24/11), 1260 (26/11), 1261 (28/11), 1262 (1/12), 1263 (3/12), 1264 (5/12), 1265 (9/12), 1266 (10/12), 1267 (12/12), 1268 (16/12), 1269 (24/12), 1270 (25/12), 1271 (26/12), 1272 (29/12) and 1273 (30/12). Additional Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1251 (26152/47), 1252 (26153/47), 1253 (26154/47), 1254 (26155/47), 1256 (26157/47), 1257 (26158/47), 1259 (26160/47), 1260 (26161/47), 1261 (26162/47), 1263 (26164/47), 1264 (26165/47), 1266 (26167/47), 1267 (26168/47), 1270 (26171/47), 1271 (26172/47) and 1272 (26173/47). | SLS/194802 |
30/04/1949 | Darlington Works | New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84. Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460. |
SLS/194906 |
11/11/1961 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/11/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1257 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26158 Allocated to Neville Hill (NEV) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
29/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1949. Dep: 28/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9896 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61257 |
||
04/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1950. Dep: 30/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9895 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1952. Dep: 25/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28203 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1953. Dep: 19/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28219 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/09/1953. Dep: 01/10/1953. | ||
05/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/10/1953. Dep: 08/10/1953. | ||
05/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/05/1954. Dep: 02/06/1954. | ||
15/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/06/1954. Dep: 22/06/1954. | ||
14/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1955. Dep: 12/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28547 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/11/1956. Dep: 30/11/1956. | ||
04/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/12/1956. Dep: 05/12/1956. | ||
13/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/12/1956. Dep: 18/12/1956. | ||
29/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/01/1957. Dep: 22/02/1957. | ||
09/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1958. Dep: 13/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28407 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
28/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/01/1959. Dep: 02/02/1959. | ||
06/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/08/1959. Dep: 18/08/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
01/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
12/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/02/1960. Dep: 03/03/1960. | ||
04/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/09/1961. Dep: 05/10/1961. | ||
16/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/10/1961. Dep: 27/10/1961. | ||
02/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/11/1961. Dep: 24/11/1961. | ||
09/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
04/10/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61257 from West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
11/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth |