|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 09/01/1950 | 16/01/1950 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/03/1951 | 20/04/1951 | 24 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/12/1952 | 23/01/1953 | 25 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/02/1953 | 26/02/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/09/1954 | 28/10/1954 | 29 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 21/04/1956 | 27/04/1956 | 7 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/06/1956 | 01/08/1956 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/07/1958 | 30/08/1958 | 34 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/06/1960 | 08/07/1960 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/03/1963 | 25/04/1963 | 44 days | General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1949 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'K.1' 2-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 62012 (1/7),62013, 62014, 62015, 62016, 62017, 62018, 62019, 62020, 62021, 62022, 62023.62024, 62025, 62026, 62027, 62028, 62029, 62030, 62031, 62032, 62033 and 62034, while No. 62038 was 'road steamed' at the Works on 30/8. Further Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 62012/13 (26616/17/1949), 62015 (26619/1949), 62018/19 (26622/23/1949), 62022/23 (26626/27/1949), 62026-31 (26630-35/1949) and 62033/34 (26637/38/1949). | SLS/194910 |
10/03/1963 | Goole MPD (Paint Shop) | Stored at Goole on 10th March-60518. | SLS/196304 |
23/04/1963 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: E3090-5 no bogies, D5583, D5819, D6744. Works, Shunters : 68928/71/6. Awaiting Works: D203, D2010, D2561, D5510/95, D5602/57, D6707, D8240. Stored in Works Yards : 15004, 60014/39/49/54/76/137/500/17/26/39, 61135, 68925, 69523, 90250/3/70. Crimpsall: 60057/117/21/34/52, 62027/50, 90572/3, Dept. 10, D2008/27, D2567, D2957, D3625/45/63, D5045/70, D5523/42/84/5/609/54, D6709/804, D8205, D8401/9, D9008/19. Stripping Shop: 90043/109/33/602, D5655, D5804. Works Yard: 61348 in steam. Weigh House: 90024/569, D5822. Paint Shop: LNER 4771, 62024, 90036, D1517, D3685, D5050/5/94, D6834/5/6, E3083. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/08/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 62024 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26628 Allocated to Blaydon (BLA) |
||
09/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/01/1950. Dep: 16/01/1950. | ||
28/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1951. Dep: 20/04/1951. | ||
30/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1952. Dep: 23/01/1953. | ||
23/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/02/1953. Dep: 26/02/1953. | ||
30/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1954. Dep: 28/10/1954. | ||
21/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/04/1956. Dep: 27/04/1956. | ||
20/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1956. Dep: 01/08/1956. | ||
28/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1958. Dep: 30/08/1958. | ||
01/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1960. Dep: 08/07/1960. | ||
06/05/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
13/03/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1963. Dep: 25/04/1963. | ||
28/02/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) | ||
1967 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
13/02/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 62024 from Blyth (North) (52F) |