|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 12/04/1919 | 09/08/1919 | 120 days | General | Boiler number 1496 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/09/1921 | 15/10/1921 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1465 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/10/1923 | 15/12/1923 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1468 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/06/1925 | 19/09/1925 | 99 days | General | Boiler number 1939 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6224 |
||
Gorton Works | 17/12/1927 | 28/01/1928 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 22/02/1930 | 29/03/1930 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1089 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/08/1932 | 03/09/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1118 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/07/1935 | 27/07/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 927 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/02/1938 | 12/03/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3219 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/05/1941 | 24/05/1941 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1023 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/08/1942 | 05/09/1942 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 03/11/1943 | 27/11/1943 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 3366 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/03/1946 | 30/03/1946 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 21/12/1946 | 18/01/1947 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3314 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/07/1948 | 07/08/1948 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3281 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/05/1949 | 27/08/1949 | 113 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5119 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63571 |
||
Gorton Works | 22/09/1951 | 13/10/1951 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28353 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/09/1952 | 18/10/1952 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 29/08/1953 | 12/09/1953 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 28303 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/10/1954 | 23/10/1954 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 30/07/1955 | 03/09/1955 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28883 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/08/1957 | 14/09/1957 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28286 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/01/1962 | 07/03/1962 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 28463 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
13/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D3453, E3088-94. Outside Erecting Shop: 60817, 61375, 61861/99, 63858, 68900, 70003/7. Erecting Shop: D2406, D3289, 13336, D3487, D5522/47/95, D5822. D8021, 08213, D9012, 12133, 43032, 60025/47/61/87, 60134, 60854, 61051, 61223/52, 61374, 62013, 63924/38, 70006, 76046. Stripping Road-dept. 10/1: 60938, 62034, 63571. Outside Crimpsal: D3482. 70018. Crimpsal: 60014/43/63/83/97. Outside Weighshop: 60138/57. Paint Shop: D374 (BE 3120 VF D670 of 1961), D5369 (BRCW DEL 212 of 1961), D5644, D5828 (Brush 364 of 1961), D5830 (Brush 366 of 1961), E3086/7, 60027/84 an 60125. | SLS/196202 |
28/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D5643, D8213, E3072-6. Stripping Road: D4055/63, 60129, 60853, 61285, 61315, 63630, 73036. Crimpsall: 60119, 63962. Outside Crimpsall: 60870, 60938, 61168, 62021/34. Scrap Road: 68900 intact, 61862, 61908 being cut up. Erecting Shop: D3482, D5525/95, D5642/57, 12126/33, 13288, 60043/61/78/83/97, 60107, 60817, 61252, 61374/5, 61899, 63571, 70003/7, 76021. Erecting Shop Yard: 60062, 60112. Boiler Park: 60014/47. Weigh House: D5547. Outside Weigh House: D3289, 61223, 63924, 68928, 70006. Paint Shop: D3336, D3487, D5371/2, D5822, E3070/1, 60087, 76046. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196203 |
26/02/1962 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1224 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19880 Allocated to Annesley (ANN) Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
12/04/1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1919. Dep: 09/08/1919. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1496 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/09/1919 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
03/09/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1921. Dep: 15/10/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1465 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/10/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1923. Dep: 15/12/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1468 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1925. Dep: 19/09/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1939 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6224 |
||
17/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1927. Dep: 28/01/1928. | ||
22/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1930. Dep: 29/03/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1089 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1932. Dep: 03/09/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1118 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1935. Dep: 27/07/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 927 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1938. Dep: 12/03/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3219 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
03/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1941. Dep: 24/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1023 (Diagram 15) |
||
31/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/08/1942. Dep: 05/09/1942. | ||
03/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1943. Dep: 27/11/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3366 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
23/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/03/1946. Dep: 30/03/1946. | ||
01/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3571 | ||
21/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1946. Dep: 18/01/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3314 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
03/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1948. Dep: 07/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3281 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1949. Dep: 27/08/1949. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5119 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63571 |
||
22/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1951. Dep: 13/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28353 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/09/1952. Dep: 18/10/1952. | ||
29/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1953. Dep: 12/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28303 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/10/1954. Dep: 23/10/1954. | ||
30/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1955. Dep: 03/09/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28883 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/03/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
17/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1957. Dep: 14/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28286 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) | ||
09/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1962. Dep: 07/03/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28463 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/12/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63571 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |