|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 15/01/1921 | 12/02/1921 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1873 (Diagram 15) Ross Pop |
||
Gorton Works | 10/11/1923 | 19/01/1924 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 12/06/1926 | 02/10/1926 | 113 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6228 |
||
Gorton Works | 03/11/1928 | 02/02/1929 | 92 days | General | Boiler number 1957 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/05/1931 | 23/05/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1873 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/11/1933 | 02/12/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1041 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/12/1935 | 18/01/1936 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 3228 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/12/1937 | 08/01/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 813 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/01/1940 | 20/01/1940 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 858 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/03/1942 | 04/04/1942 | 16 days | General | Boiler number 3214 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/07/1944 | 02/09/1944 | 36 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 5017 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/09/1947 | 27/09/1947 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 5041 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/01/1948 | 14/02/1948 | 34 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3575 |
||
Gorton Works | 23/10/1948 | 30/10/1948 | 8 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63575 |
||
Gorton Works | 04/06/1949 | 11/06/1949 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 19/11/1949 | 03/12/1949 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 5038 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/12/1951 | 29/12/1951 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28368 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/11/1952 | 22/11/1952 | 22 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 20/02/1954 | 13/03/1954 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28811 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/09/1956 | 29/09/1956 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28849 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/12/1957 | 21/12/1957 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 09/04/1960 | 21/05/1960 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 28392 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/05/1960 | 04/06/1960 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 11/06/1960 | 18/06/1960 | 8 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1228 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19884 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
03/11/1912 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
15/01/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1921. Dep: 12/02/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1873 (Diagram 15) Ross Pop |
||
10/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1923. Dep: 19/01/1924. | ||
12/06/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1926. Dep: 02/10/1926. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6228 |
||
03/11/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1928. Dep: 02/02/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1957 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1931. Dep: 23/05/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1873 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1933. Dep: 02/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1041 (Diagram 15) |
||
31/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1935. Dep: 18/01/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3228 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
25/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/12/1937. Dep: 08/01/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 813 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1940. Dep: 20/01/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 858 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1942. Dep: 04/04/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3214 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1944. Dep: 02/09/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 5017 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3575 | ||
06/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1947. Dep: 27/09/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5041 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/01/1948. Dep: 14/02/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3575 |
||
31/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swindon (SDN) | ||
23/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/10/1948. Dep: 30/10/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63575 |
||
23/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
29/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
04/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/06/1949. Dep: 11/06/1949. | ||
19/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1949. Dep: 03/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5038 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
11/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
16/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
08/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1951. Dep: 29/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28368 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
06/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
01/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 01/11/1952. Dep: 22/11/1952. | ||
20/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
20/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1954. Dep: 13/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28811 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1956. Dep: 29/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28849 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/12/1957. Dep: 21/12/1957. | ||
09/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1960. Dep: 21/05/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28392 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/05/1960. Dep: 04/06/1960. | ||
11/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/06/1960. Dep: 18/06/1960. | ||
03/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63575 from Gorton (9G) |