|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 08/01/1921 | 26/02/1921 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 10/03/1923 | 12/05/1923 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 1745 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/09/1925 | 21/11/1925 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 1047 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5399 |
||
Gorton Works | 11/08/1928 | 06/10/1928 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1405 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/06/1930 | 26/07/1930 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 30/07/1932 | 13/08/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1085 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/08/1935 | 14/09/1935 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3207 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/12/1937 | 31/12/1937 | 14 days | General | Chimney altered Boiler number 3310 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/05/1940 | 08/06/1940 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3315 (Diagram 15) |
||
Stratford Works | 15/05/1943 | 26/06/1943 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3236 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/03/1945 | 24/03/1945 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3250 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/11/1947 | 06/12/1947 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 809 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/08/1950 | 26/08/1950 | 15 days | General | Renumbered to BR 63624 |
||
Gorton Works | 30/10/1951 | 10/11/1951 | 12 days | Light Casual | Tender changed |
||
Gorton Works | 30/08/1952 | 20/09/1952 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22295 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/03/1955 | 14/05/1955 | 57 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28880 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/12/1956 | 15/12/1956 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 06/12/1958 | 10/01/1959 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28307 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1914 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 399 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
01/12/1916 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
08/01/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1921. Dep: 26/02/1921. | ||
10/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1923. Dep: 12/05/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1745 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
05/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1925. Dep: 21/11/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1047 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5399 |
||
11/08/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
11/08/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1928. Dep: 06/10/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1405 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/10/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
28/06/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1930. Dep: 26/07/1930. | ||
30/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1932. Dep: 13/08/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1085 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/08/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
24/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1935. Dep: 14/09/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3207 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
30/01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
18/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1937. Dep: 31/12/1937. Work undertaken: Chimney altered Boiler number 3310 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1940. Dep: 08/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3315 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1943. Dep: 26/06/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3236 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
03/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1945. Dep: 24/03/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3250 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
13/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3624 | ||
20/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
15/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1947. Dep: 06/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 809 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
12/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1950. Dep: 26/08/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63624 |
||
30/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/10/1951. Dep: 10/11/1951. Work undertaken: Tender changed |
||
30/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1952. Dep: 20/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22295 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/03/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
07/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
20/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
19/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1955. Dep: 14/05/1955. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28880 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/12/1956. Dep: 15/12/1956. | ||
06/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1958. Dep: 10/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28307 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63624 from Sheffield Darnall (41A) |