|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 16/10/1920 | 11/12/1920 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 09/12/1922 | 17/02/1923 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 06/09/1924 | 01/11/1924 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1736 (Diagram 15B) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5421 |
||
Gorton Works | 25/04/1925 | 09/05/1925 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 29/10/1927 | 03/12/1927 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1734 (Diagram 15B) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/02/1929 | 30/03/1929 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 10/10/1931 | 31/10/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1 (Diagram 15B) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/05/1933 | 27/05/1933 | 8 days | Light Repair | Rail washing gear fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 05/10/1935 | 19/10/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1738 (Diagram 15B) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
Gorton Works | 03/09/1938 | 01/10/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 58 (Diagram 15B) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/09/1941 | 11/10/1941 | 19 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/6 Boiler number 3421 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 781 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1919 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 421 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15B boiler fitted |
||
20/09/1919 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
16/10/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1920. Dep: 11/12/1920. | ||
09/12/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1922. Dep: 17/02/1923. | ||
06/09/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1924. Dep: 01/11/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1736 (Diagram 15B) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5421 |
||
25/04/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/04/1925. Dep: 09/05/1925. | ||
29/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1927. Dep: 03/12/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1734 (Diagram 15B) |
||
23/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1929. Dep: 30/03/1929. | ||
10/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1931. Dep: 31/10/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1 (Diagram 15B) |
||
01/04/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
20/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/05/1933. Dep: 27/05/1933. Work undertaken: Rail washing gear fitted |
||
05/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1935. Dep: 19/10/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1738 (Diagram 15B) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
03/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1938. Dep: 01/10/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 58 (Diagram 15B) |
||
23/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1941. Dep: 11/10/1941. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/6 Boiler number 3421 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 781 |
||
11/10/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 781 from March (MAR) |