Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 417 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 417 Week
» 135233 Month
» 337897 Year
» 3364750 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Hull & Barnsley Railway |
130 |
m/e |
10/1907 |
North Eastern Railway |
3130 |
y/e |
1922 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2511 |
|
25/07/1924 |
Notes
Notes |
Cut up at Darlngton |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1907 |
Diagram Q10 boiler fitted (number Q10_130) |
19/01/1925 |
Diagram Q10domed boiler fitted (number D1685) |
|
Works Visits
Works |
Stopped |
Entry |
Departure |
Duration |
Level of Work |
Actual |
Mileage |
|
|
1922 |
20/12/1922 |
|
General |
Renumbered to NER 3130
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
01/07/1924 |
19/01/1925 |
203 days |
General |
Boiler number D1685 (Diagram Q10domed) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 2511
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
21/03/1927 |
08/06/1927 |
80 days |
General |
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
04/06/1929 |
15/08/1929 |
73 days |
General |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Hull & Barnsley Railway Number 130 Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 945 Allocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) Diagram Q10 boiler fitted |
|
|
01/07/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1924. Dep: 19/01/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1685 (Diagram Q10domed) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 2511
|
|
|
21/03/1927 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1927. Dep: 08/06/1927. |
|
|
04/06/1929 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1929. Dep: 15/08/1929. |
|
|
18/11/1929 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (SEL) |
|
|
29/12/1930 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
08/08/1931 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MAR) |
|
|
18/09/1931 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
01/10/1931 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2511 from Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|