Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 4617 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 35267 Week
» 133912 Month
» 336576 Year
» 3363429 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6742 |
m/e |
11/1930 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6742 Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 2266 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Pontypool Road (PPRD) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newport Pill (86B) |
|
|
31/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newport Pill (86B) |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) |
|
|
02/12/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6742 |
|
|
02/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|