|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1961 | Whitland MPD | 82008/30/42/4 have been allocated here. | SLS/196110 |
19/08/1962 | Wolverhampton Works (In Works) | In Works: 1020, 1630, 3615, 3721, 4636, 4697, 4703, 5181/4, 5564, 6160, 6614/8, 7739, 7816, 8104, 9422/70, 9613/24/6/47/65, 82008; Weigh house: 6156; Awaiting works: 3217, 4938/61, 5065, 5658, 7002, 7824, 9415. | SLS/196209 |
31/05/1964 | Eastleigh Works (Scrap Yard) | Works Yard, Waiting Works: 73050, 73083. Works Yard, Ex Works: 34089, 73114. Erecting Shop: 30069, 32640, 32678 Undergoing restoration, 34005, 34018, 34026, 34037, 34042, 34076, 35007, 35019 35022/3, 73052, 73085/9, 76067, 76082, 80016, 80145, 80154, 15218, 15233, 20002, D3041, D3220, D3459, D3667, D6547, D6554. Scrap Yard: 30133 Intact, 34049 Remains, 82008 Intact. | SLS/196407 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/06/1952 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 82008 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Tyseley (84E) |
||
14/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) | ||
03/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barry (88C) | ||
10/09/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D) | ||
07/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Worcester (85A) | ||
30/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D) | ||
25/01/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Worcester (85A) | ||
15/07/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C) | ||
07/10/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neyland (87H) | ||
04/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Taunton (83B) | ||
07/02/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 82008 | ||
06/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Eastleigh |