Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1120 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 1120 Week
» 135936 Month
» 338600 Year
» 3365453 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
84011 |
on |
18/09/1953 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
25F |
Low Moor |
w/e |
19/09/1953 |
ALLOC |
27A |
Bank Hall |
4w/e |
29/01/1955 |
ALLOC |
24B |
Rose Grove |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
ALLOC |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
ALLOC |
24F |
Fleetwood |
4w/e |
01/04/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
24/04/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/09/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 84011 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Low Moor (25F) |
|
|
29/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A) |
|
|
19/05/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B) |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) |
|
|
25/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F) |
|
|
24/04/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 84011 |
|
|
12/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth |
|
|