|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/09/1955 | Brighton Works | An unusual visitor to this area was one of the 9F 2-10-0 with Crosti boiler, No. 92028 (15A). It has probably come for the works staff to become acquainted with its general design and layout, part of the design having been undertaken here. | SLS/195510 |
15/01/1956 | Crewe Area | On 15th January, the new Locomotive Inspection and Repair Building situated between Crewe Station and Crewe South Shed, appeared to be complete. This plant forms part of the £1 million plan announced some two years ago for increased facilities for the running sheds. Noted in the works yard were Crosti 2-10-0s Nos. 92024/28; both had been fitted with windshields situated midway between smokebox and cab, this no doubt being a further attempt to cure the final chimney gasses fouling the cab. These two engines certainly bore evidence of this. | SLS/195605 |
04/02/1962 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) | Paint Shop: Closed indefinitely through £50 damage being wilfully caused to paintwork of D58 by a singularly irresponsible visitor in a party on 28/1/62. Outside Paint Shop: D62/3, 45436, 45660/99, 48555. New Erecting Shop: D4/6/7, D64, D213/7/31/4/88, D317. Erecting Shop: D50-5/65-7, D237, D8044, 42150, 42484, 42550, 42617, 44661/94, 44713, 44839, 44904, 45051/8/76/8, 45144, 45209/50, 45412, 45606/48, 45723, 46106/36/8/69, 46231/6, 46420, 48039, 48366, 48478, 48503, 49277, 70029, 78039, 90190, 90245/57/61/85, 92028/77/81/3, 92111/57. Erecting Shop Yard: 42280, 45208, 45304/5/15, 46257, 52312, 90096, 90665, 92076. Works Sidings: 41239, 42445, 44709/35/70, 44870/3/95, 45093, 45211, 45494, 45522, 45642/5/52/76, 46249/56, 46431, 47334, 47580, 47631, 48325, 48400, 48550, 48624, 48708, 78036, 90125, 92089. Scrap Road: Nil. | SLS/196203 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/07/1955 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 92028 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
||
17/12/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kettering (15B) | ||
13/10/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltley (21A) | ||
30/11/1963 | Allocation | |||
18/04/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltley (2E) | ||
06/03/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Banbury (2D) | ||
17/07/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltley (2E) | ||
22/10/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 92028 | ||
01/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |