Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 2534 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33184 Week
» 131829 Month
» 334493 Year
» 3361346 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
8629 |
m/e |
03/1944 |
War Dept. |
78629 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90632 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2299 |
Works Number |
5030 |
To Service |
During 03/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 08/05/1965 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 2 mths , 9 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 8629 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5030 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78629 |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90632 |
|
|
21/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Accrington (24A) |
|
|
14/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
17/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
10/11/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Agecroft (26B) |
|
|
01/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Agecroft (26B) |
|
|
17/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
30/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (8L) |
|
|
08/05/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90632 |
|
|
08/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|