Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 4306 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34956 Week
» 133601 Month
» 336265 Year
» 3363118 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
79310 |
m/e |
05/1945 |
British Railways |
90730 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2313 |
Works Number |
5253 |
To Service |
During 05/1945 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 03/10/1965 |
Service Life |
20 yrs, 5 mths , 3 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/03/1962 |
Gorton Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: E26011/34, E27005, 63689, 63720/81, 90013/101/30/3/280/300/1/2, 90447/84, 90541/611/65/730, 92014/92/102. Outside Erecting Shop: E26000/26/33/47, 64744, 63612, 63730/62, 63775, 90103. |
SLS/196204 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1945 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 79310 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5253 |
|
|
13/08/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (NWE) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90730 |
|
|
29/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
11/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
03/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90730 |
|
|
01/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|