Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3506 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34156 Week
» 132801 Month
» 335465 Year
» 3362318 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Scrapyard: Harry Needle Railroad Company at Crewe Works
Locomotives
Type |
Company |
Class |
Wheels |
Number when Cut |
Date Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Service (yrs) |
Awaiting Scrap (yrs) |
|
Depot on Withdrawal |
Date Scrapped |
Age (yrs) |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47844 |
23/05/1964 |
01/05/2002 |
37.964 |
2.460 |
|
|
10/2004 |
40.425 |
Electric |
BR |
86 |
Bo-Bo |
86611 |
27/09/1965 |
11/2003 |
38.159 |
1.216 |
|
|
01/02/2005 |
39.375 |
Electric |
BR |
86 |
Bo-Bo |
86631 |
29/10/1965 |
11/2003 |
38.071 |
1.293 |
|
|
01/03/2005 |
39.364 |