Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 3777 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 3777 Week
» 138593 Month
» 341257 Year
» 3368110 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Scrapyard: Morley Waste Traders Leeds
Locomotives
Type |
Company |
Class |
Wheels |
Number when Cut |
Date Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Service (yrs) |
Awaiting Scrap (yrs) |
|
Depot on Withdrawal |
Date Scrapped |
Age (yrs) |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08113 |
07/10/1955 |
18/03/1984 |
28.466 |
23.132 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
30/04/2007 |
51.597 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08413 |
27/06/1958 |
30/06/2004 |
46.041 |
2.833 |
|
|
30/04/2007 |
48.874 |