Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 576 Today
» 5153 Yesterday
» 5729 Week
» 140545 Month
» 343209 Year
» 3370062 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Scrapyard: National Coal Board Cortonwood
Locomotives
Type |
Company |
Class |
Wheels |
Number when Cut |
Date Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Service (yrs) |
Awaiting Scrap (yrs) |
|
Depot on Withdrawal |
Date Scrapped |
Age (yrs) |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2328 |
06/06/1961 |
16/09/1968 |
7.285 |
17.838 |
|
|
07/1986 |
25.123 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2317 |
22/02/1961 |
30/09/1969 |
8.608 |
16.970 |
|
|
09/1986 |
25.578 |