Locomotive Classes of the London, Midland & Scottish Railway
Designer | Class | Pre Grouping Class | Wheels | Year | Pre Grouping | Big 4 | BR Power Class | Number Range | First | Last | # | Thumbnail |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fowler | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1924 | LMS | 40900 - 41199 | 02/1924 | 07/1961 | 195 | ||||
Fowler | 3F | 0-6-0T | 1924 | LMS | 3F | 47260 - 47681 | 07/1924 | 10/1967 | 422 | |||
Hughes | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 1926 | LMS | 42700 - 42944 | 19/06/1926 | 21/01/1967 | 245 | ![]() |
|||
Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | 1927 | LMS | 47967 - 47999 | 04/1927 | 14/03/1958 | 33 | |||||
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow | 7P | 4-6-0 | 1927 | LMS | 46100 - 46170 | 14/08/1927 | 01/01/1966 | 70 | ![]() |
|||
Fowler | 4P | 2-6-4T | 1927 | LMS | 42300 - 42424 | 09/12/1927 | 09/1966 | 125 | ![]() |
|||
Fowler | 2P | 4-4-0 | 1928 | LMS | 40563 - 40700 | 03/1928 | 17/12/1962 | 136 | ||||
Fowler | 2F | 0-6-0T | 1928 | LMS | 47160 - 47169 | 12/1928 | 09/1964 | 10 | ||||
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow | Fury | 4-6-0 | 1929 | LMS | 6399 | 1 | ||||||
Sentinel | 0-4-0T | 1929 | LMS | 47190 - 47191 | 09/1929 | 03/1961 | 2 | ![]() |
||||
Fowler | 7F | 0-8-0 | 1929 | LMS | 7F | 49500 - 49674 | 26/03/1929 | 20/01/1962 | 175 | ![]() |
||
Sentinel | 0-4-0T | 1930 | LMS | 47180 - 47184 | 06/1930 | 11/1956 | 5 | |||||
Fowler | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 1930 | LMS | 6P | 45500 - 45551 | 08/11/1930 | 30/10/1965 | 52 | |||
Fowler | 3P | 2-6-2T | 1930 | LMS | 40001 - 40070 | 17/03/1930 | 15/12/1962 | 70 | ![]() |
|||
0F | 0-4-0ST | 1932 | LMS | 0F | 47000 - 47009 | 11/1932 | 12/1966 | 10 | ![]() |
|||
Stanier | 2P | 0-4-4T | 1932 | LMS | 41900 - 41909 | 12/1932 | 03/1962 | 10 | ||||
Stanier | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 1933 | LMS | 46200 - 46212 | 27/06/1933 | 17/11/1962 | 13 | ![]() |
|||
Stanier | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 1933 | LMS | 6P5F | 42945 - 42984 | 21/10/1933 | 11/02/1967 | 40 | ![]() |
||
Stanier | 4P | 2-6-4T | 1934 | LMS | 42500 - 42536 | 06/03/1934 | 18/06/1962 | 37 | ![]() |
|||
Stanier | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 1934 | LMS | 44658 - 45499 | 08/1934 | 08/1968 | 842 | ![]() |
|||
Stanier | 6P | 4-6-0 | 1934 | LMS | 45552 - 45742 | 10/05/1934 | 11/1967 | 191 | ||||
Stanier | 3P | 2-6-2T | 1935 | LMS | 40071 - 40209 | 15/02/1935 | 29/12/1962 | 139 | ![]() |
|||
Stanier | 4P | 2-6-4T | 1935 | LMS | 42425 - 42672 | 09/12/1935 | 10/1967 | 206 | ![]() |
|||
Stanier | 8F | 2-8-0 | 1935 | LMS | 48000 - 48775 | 06/1935 | 04/08/1968 | 666 | ![]() |
|||
Stanier | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 1937 | LMS | 46220 - 46257 | 06/1937 | 10/1964 | 38 | ![]() |
|||
Fairburn | 4P | 2-6-4T | 1945 | LMS | 42050 - 42699 | 28/03/1945 | 10/1967 | 277 | ![]() |
|||
Ivatt | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 1946 | LMS | 2MT | 41200 - 41329 | 12/1946 | 07/1967 | 130 | ![]() |
||
Ivatt | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 1946 | LMS | 2MT | 46400 - 46527 | 12/1946 | 06/1967 | 128 | ![]() |
||
Ivatt | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 1947 | LMS | 43000 - 43161 | 12/1947 | 22/06/1968 | 162 | ![]() |