Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 323 Today
» 5773 Yesterday
» 11249 Week
» 104483 Month
» 564424 Year
» 5003861 Total
|
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotives of the South Eastern and Chatham Railway
Build Date |
SECR Class |
SR Class |
First SECR Number |
Wheels |
Designer |
Manufacturer |
Order Number |
Works Number |
Withdrawn |
11/1886 |
|
|
1002 |
4-4-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
06/1948 |
12/1886 |
|
|
1078 |
4-4-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
03/1949 |
12/1889 |
|
|
1028 |
4-4-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
05/1948 |
10/1891 |
|
|
1215 |
4-4-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
05/1948 |
10/1893 |
|
|
1231 |
4-4-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
03/1949 |
09/1894 |
|
|
1031 |
4-4-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
05/1948 |
03/1896 |
|
|
1042 |
4-4-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
02/1948 |
03/1896 |
|
|
1105 |
4-4-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
02/1949 |
10/1899 |
|
|
1151 |
4-4-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
12/03/1949 |
02/1900 |
|
|
676 |
4-4-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5607 |
11/1926 |
02/1900 |
|
|
677 |
4-4-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5608 |
12/1925 |
02/1900 |
|
|
678 |
4-4-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5609 |
06/1924 |
03/1900 |
|
|
679 |
4-4-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5610 |
12/1925 |
03/1900 |
|
|
680 |
4-4-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5611 |
09/1927 |
06/1900 |
|
|
255 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
30/09/1961 |
06/1900 |
|
|
256 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
29/07/1961 |
06/1900 |
|
|
257 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
08/1949 |
06/1900 |
|
|
681 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5687 |
14/02/1959 |
06/1900 |
|
|
682 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5688 |
21/10/1961 |
06/1900 |
|
|
683 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5689 |
13/06/1959 |
06/1900 |
|
|
684 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5690 |
21/10/1961 |
06/1900 |
|
|
685 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5691 |
10/1951 |
06/1900 |
|
|
686 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5692 |
05/05/1962 |
07/1900 |
|
|
191 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
09/1959 |
07/1900 |
|
|
63 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
04/1956 |
07/1900 |
|
|
687 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5693 |
02/04/1955 |
07/1900 |
|
|
688 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5694 |
20/02/1960 |
07/1900 |
|
|
689 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5695 |
31/03/1962 |
07/1900 |
|
|
690 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5696 |
23/06/1962 |
07/1900 |
|
|
691 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5697 |
21/10/1961 |
07/1900 |
|
|
692 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5698 |
23/04/1960 |
07/1900 |
|
|
693 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5699 |
10/06/1961 |
07/1900 |
|
|
694 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5700 |
25/03/1961 |
07/1900 |
|
|
695 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5701 |
24/06/1961 |
09/1900 |
|
|
102 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
05/1960 |
09/1900 |
|
|
112 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
05/05/1962 |
09/1900 |
|
|
86 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
22/10/1960 |
10/1900 |
|
|
18 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
10/01/1959 |
10/1900 |
|
|
33 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
19/03/1960 |
11/1900 |
|
|
696 |
0-4-4T |
H. Wainwright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4668 |
03/03/1951 |
11/1900 |
|
|
697 |
0-4-4T |
H. Wainwright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4669 |
03/1953 |
11/1900 |
|
|
698 |
0-4-4T |
H. Wainwright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4670 |
15/10/1955 |
11/1900 |
|
|
699 |
0-4-4T |
H. Wainwright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4671 |
01/1950 |
11/1900 |
|
|
700 |
0-4-4T |
H. Wainwright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4672 |
10/1952 |
11/1900 |
|
|
701 |
0-4-4T |
H. Wainwright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4673 |
12/1929 |
11/1900 |
|
|
702 |
0-4-4T |
H. Wainwright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4674 |
06/1929 |
11/1900 |
|
|
703 |
0-4-4T |
H. Wainwright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4675 |
03/1954 |
11/1900 |
|
|
704 |
0-4-4T |
H. Wainwright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4676 |
14/04/1956 |
11/1900 |
|
|
705 |
0-4-4T |
H. Wainwright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4677 |
09/06/1951 |
12/1900 |
|
|
218 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
05/05/1962 |
12/1900 |
|
|
219 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
10/10/1959 |
12/1900 |
|
|
225 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
04/06/1955 |
12/1900 |
|
|
227 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
24/10/1959 |
12/1900 |
|
|
706 |
0-4-4T |
H. Wainwright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4678 |
12/1952 |
12/1900 |
|
|
707 |
0-4-4T |
H. Wainwright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4679 |
02/1949 |
12/1900 |
|
|
708 |
0-4-4T |
H. Wainwright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4680 |
11/10/1952 |
12/1900 |
|
|
709 |
0-4-4T |
H. Wainwright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4681 |
10/1949 |
12/1900 |
|
|
710 |
0-4-4T |
H. Wainwright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4682 |
06/1951 |
12/1900 |
|
|
711 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4683 |
05/01/1957 |
12/1900 |
|
|
712 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4684 |
09/02/1957 |
12/1900 |
|
|
713 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4685 |
02/04/1955 |
12/1900 |
|
|
714 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4686 |
07/1961 |
12/1900 |
|
|
715 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4687 |
11/11/1961 |
01/1901 |
|
|
229 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
10/1961 |
01/1901 |
|
|
716 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4688 |
21/10/1961 |
01/1901 |
|
|
717 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4689 |
24/02/1962 |
01/1901 |
|
|
718 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4690 |
24/09/1955 |
01/1901 |
|
|
719 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4691 |
19/05/1962 |
01/1901 |
|
|
720 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4692 |
21/10/1961 |
01/1901 |
|
|
721 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4693 |
31/03/1962 |
01/1901 |
|
|
722 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4694 |
05/05/1962 |
01/1901 |
|
|
723 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4695 |
27/01/1962 |
01/1901 |
|
|
724 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4696 |
05/05/1962 |
01/1901 |
|
|
725 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4697 |
27/08/1960 |
03/1901 |
|
|
221 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
15/08/1959 |
03/1901 |
|
|
223 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
14/05/1960 |
03/1901 |
|
|
37 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
25/02/1961 |
03/1901 |
|
|
54 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
20/08/1960 |
04/1901 |
|
|
234 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
08/08/1953 |
07/1901 |
|
|
38 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
03/1954 |
07/1901 |
|
|
4 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
11/11/1961 |
07/1901 |
|
|
61 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
29/07/1961 |
07/1901 |
|
|
71 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
09/1959 |
02/1902 |
|
|
592 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Longhedge Works |
?? |
|
07/1963 |
03/1902 |
|
|
113 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
15/07/1961 |
04/1902 |
|
|
242 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
30/09/1961 |
04/1902 |
|
|
243 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
10/10/1959 |
04/1902 |
|
|
244 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
21/10/1961 |
05/1902 |
|
|
593 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Longhedge Works |
?? |
|
08/02/1958 |
10/1902 |
|
|
460 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Longhedge Works |
?? |
|
02/1949 |
11/1902 |
|
|
150 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
21/10/1961 |
11/1902 |
|
|
59 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
22/02/1958 |
12/1902 |
|
|
245 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
08/08/1959 |
12/1902 |
|
|
252 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
07/1959 |
12/1902 |
|
|
461 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Longhedge Works |
?? |
|
31/08/1958 |
12/1902 |
|
|
486 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Longhedge Works |
?? |
|
05/1953 |
01/1903 |
|
|
253 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
17/10/1959 |
01/1903 |
|
|
68 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
10/1961 |
01/1903 |
|
|
90 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
08/08/1953 |
05/1903 |
|
|
576 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
07/11/1959 |
05/1903 |
|
|
581 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
12/03/1960 |
06/1903 |
|
|
582 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
07/06/1958 |
06/1903 |
|
|
584 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
17/02/1962 |
06/1903 |
|
|
585 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
14/02/1959 |
08/1903 |
|
|
580 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Longhedge Works |
?? |
|
08/08/1953 |
08/1903 |
|
|
583 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Longhedge Works |
?? |
|
07/1961 |
09/1903 |
|
|
572 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
03/1954 |
09/1903 |
|
|
573 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
18/11/1961 |
09/1903 |
|
|
575 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
22/07/1961 |
10/1903 |
|
|
578 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
24/06/1961 |
10/1903 |
|
|
579 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
07/10/1961 |
01/1904 |
|
|
267 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
30/06/1962 |
01/1904 |
|
|
480 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Longhedge Works |
?? |
|
08/07/1961 |
02/1904 |
|
|
268 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
05/05/1962 |
02/1904 |
|
|
271 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
07/1963 |
02/1904 |
|
|
272 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
08/08/1959 |
02/1904 |
|
|
277 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
09/1955 |
04/1904 |
|
|
481 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Longhedge Works |
?? |
|
11/11/1961 |
06/1904 |
|
|
270 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
20/06/1959 |
06/1904 |
|
|
495 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
11/03/1961 |
06/1904 |
|
|
498 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
29/07/1961 |
06/1904 |
|
|
499 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
12/1947 |
07/1904 |
|
|
508 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
28/09/1957 |
07/1904 |
|
|
510 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
30/06/1962 |
08/1904 |
|
|
260 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
05/1953 |
08/1904 |
|
|
262 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
12/1947 |
02/1906 |
|
|
1273 |
4-4-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
12/1951 |
02/1906 |
|
|
1275 |
4-4-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
03/1951 |
02/1907 |
|
|
1587 |
4-4-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
28/07/1951 |
07/1907 |
|
|
1166 |
4-4-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
21/05/1955 |
07/1907 |
|
|
1491 |
4-4-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
02/1953 |
09/1907 |
|
|
1515 |
4-4-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
21/07/1951 |
12/1907 |
|
|
1157 |
4-4-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
03/1951 |
12/1907 |
|
|
1176 |
4-4-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
10/1951 |
12/1907 |
|
|
1514 |
4-4-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
12/1951 |
02/1908 |
|
|
280 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
07/1963 |
02/1908 |
|
|
291 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
05/1953 |
03/1908 |
|
|
298 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
11/1960 |
03/1908 |
|
|
317 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
24/02/1962 |
03/1908 |
|
|
588 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
23/06/1962 |
03/1908 |
|
|
589 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
11/11/1961 |
04/1908 |
|
|
1516 |
4-4-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
06/10/1951 |
05/1908 |
|
|
287 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
08/10/1960 |
06/1908 |
|
|
293 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
05/05/1962 |
06/1908 |
|
|
294 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
10/1955 |
06/1908 |
|
|
297 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
12/09/1959 |
06/1908 |
|
|
513 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
03/1955 |
07/1908 |
|
|
590 |
0-6-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
11/02/1961 |
08/1908 |
|
|
1175 |
4-4-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
10/1951 |
09/1908 |
|
|
1547 |
4-4-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
02/1951 |
11/1908 |
|
|
1159 |
4-4-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
12/1951 |
12/1908 |
|
|
1036 |
4-4-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
10/03/1951 |
02/1909 |
|
|
1556 |
0-6-0T |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
24/06/1961 |
02/1909 |
|
|
1557 |
0-6-0T |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
21/09/1957 |
04/1909 |
|
|
1315 |
4-4-0 |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
20/03/1954 |
02/1910 |
|
|
1027 |
0-6-0T |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
25/03/1961 |
02/1910 |
|
|
1178 |
0-6-0T |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
07/06/1958 |
06/1910 |
|
|
1555 |
0-6-0T |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
05/02/1955 |
06/1910 |
|
|
1558 |
0-6-0T |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
06/02/1960 |
07/1910 |
|
|
1323 |
0-6-0T |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
09/07/1960 |
07/1910 |
|
|
1325 |
0-6-0T |
H. Wainwright |
Ashford Works |
?? |
|
19/03/1960 |