Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 31 Online
» 1779 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 32429 Week
» 131074 Month
» 333738 Year
» 3360591 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #2188/27773
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
97 |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
J39 |
2708 |
|
21/10/1931 |
J39 |
2721 |
|
22/09/1934 |
J39 |
1255 |
|
04/09/1937 |
J39 |
2951 |
|
17/08/1940 |
J39 |
1266 |
|
05/12/1942 |
J39 |
4974 |
|
06/04/1946 |
J39 |
64770 |
|
16/10/1948 |
J39 |
64828 |
|
09/01/1954 |
|