Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2912 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33562 Week
» 132207 Month
» 334871 Year
» 3361724 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #6645
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HB |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Star |
4064 |
READING ABBEY |
24/03/1937 |
Castle |
5033 |
BROUGHTON CASTLE |
16/06/1942 |
Castle |
5076 |
GLADIATOR |
22/05/1946 |
Castle |
5078 |
BEAUFORT |
22/12/1947 |
Castle |
5083 |
BATH ABBEY |
13/12/1949 |
Castle |
4088 |
DARTMOUTH CASTLE |
15/03/1951 |
Castle |
4095 |
HARLECH CASTLE |
04/02/1952 |
Castle |
5078 |
BEAUFORT |
05/01/1956 |
Castle |
7018 |
DRYSLLWYN CASTLE |
03/04/1958 |
Castle |
5057 |
EARL WALDEGRAVE |
24/03/1960 |
|