Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 286 Today
» 5422 Yesterday
» 21320 Week
» 119965 Month
» 322629 Year
» 3349482 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #7603
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HC |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
7011 |
BANBURY CASTLE |
17/06/1948 |
Castle |
7014 |
CAERHAYS CASTLE |
14/06/1950 |
Castle |
7003 |
ELMLEY CASTLE |
17/06/1952 |
Castle |
5042 |
WINCHESTER CASTLE |
19/02/1957 |
Castle |
7037 |
SWINDON |
25/08/1960 |
|