Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2526 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33176 Week
» 131821 Month
» 334485 Year
» 3361338 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #29863
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
118 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A1 |
60143 |
SIR WALTER SCOTT |
25/02/1953 |
A1 |
60133 |
POMMERN |
24/08/1955 |
A1 |
60136 |
ALCAZAR |
19/07/1957 |
A1 |
60124 |
KENILWORTH |
12/08/1959 |
A1 |
60121 |
SILURIAN |
15/05/1963 |
|