Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 3806 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34456 Week
» 133101 Month
» 335765 Year
» 3362618 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #29787
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
117 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A2 |
60520 |
OWEN TUDOR |
21/03/1952 |
A2 |
60518 |
TEHRAN |
09/02/1954 |
A1 |
60153 |
FLAMBOYANT |
25/05/1955 |
A1 |
60160 |
AULD REEKIE |
02/08/1957 |
A1 |
60161 |
NORTH BRITISH |
09/07/1959 |
A1 |
60125 |
SCOTTISH UNION |
19/01/1962 |
|