Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 3334 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33984 Week
» 132629 Month
» 335293 Year
» 3362146 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #3158/29511
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
109 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
V2 |
4889 |
|
28/08/1941 |
V2 |
3660 |
|
29/06/1943 |
V2 |
60811 |
|
28/08/1948 |
V2 |
60810 |
|
17/08/1950 |
V2 |
819 |
|
18/10/1952 |
V2 |
60819 |
|
18/10/1952 |
V2 |
60971 |
|
30/07/1955 |
V2 |
60914 |
|
20/09/1957 |
V2 |
60868 |
|
12/08/1960 |
|