Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1540 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 27574 Week
» 126219 Month
» 328883 Year
» 3355736 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #4002
Type |
Hawksworth 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
47t 6cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4083 |
ABBOTSBURY CASTLE |
26/10/1946 |
Castle |
5085 |
EVESHAM ABBEY |
10/01/1947 |
Castle |
7000 |
VISCOUNT PORTAL |
17/11/1948 |
Castle |
5059 |
EARL ST ALDWYN |
24/08/1950 |
Castle |
5061 |
EARL OF BIRKENHEAD |
04/07/1952 |
|