Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1563 Today
» 4706 Yesterday
» 23132 Week
» 14188 Month
» 360612 Year
» 3387465 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2547
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5009 |
SHREWSBURY CASTLE |
09/01/1941 |
Castle |
5003 |
LULWORTH CASTLE |
16/08/1941 |
Castle |
4037 |
THE SOUTH WALES BORDERERS |
30/01/1954 |
Castle |
5021 |
WHITTINGTON CASTLE |
22/06/1955 |
Castle |
5001 |
LLANDOVERY CASTLE |
26/11/1956 |
Castle |
7015 |
CARN BREA CASTLE |
23/02/1957 |
Castle |
5038 |
MORLAIS CASTLE |
05/08/1959 |
Castle |
5040 |
STOKESAY CASTLE |
04/09/1961 |
|