SR Wainwright "B1" Class 4-4-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1013 | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1217 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1440 | FAV | Faversham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1443 | DOV | Dover Marine | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1445 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1446 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1448 | FAV | Faversham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1449 | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1450 | DOV | Dover Marine | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1451 | RAM | Ramsgate | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1452 | RAM | Ramsgate | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1453 | RAM | Ramsgate | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1454 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1455 | HIT | Hither Green | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1457 | HIT | Hither Green | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1459 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | |||
02/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1446 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | |
02/1948 | Condemned | 1445 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | COND | ||
02/1948 | Condemned | 1459 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | COND | ||
04/1948 | Condemned | 1450 | DOV | Dover Marine | COND | ||
01/04/1948 | Reallocation | 1455 | HIT | Hither Green | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | |
01/04/1948 | Reallocation | 1457 | HIT | Hither Green | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | |
01/06/1948 | Reallocation | 1440 | FAV | Faversham | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | |
01/06/1948 | Reallocation | 1453 | RAM | Ramsgate | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | |
01/06/1948 | Reallocation | 1454 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | |
01/08/1948 | Reallocation | 1013 | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | |
09/1948 | Condemned | 1013 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | COND | ||
10/1948 | Condemned | 1453 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | COND | ||
11/1948 | Condemned | 1440 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | COND | ||
11/1948 | Condemned | 1454 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | COND | ||
13/11/1948 | Reallocation | 1449 | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | |
02/1949 | Condemned | 31457 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | COND | ||
03/1949 | Condemned | 31449 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | COND | ||
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 31217 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | |
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 31443 | DOV | Dover Marine | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | |
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 31448 | FAV | Faversham | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | |
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 31451 | RAM | Ramsgate | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | |
06/1949 | Condemned | 31448 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | COND | ||
06/1949 | Condemned | 31455 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | COND | ||
30/07/1949 | Condemned | 31446 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | COND | ||
12/1949 | Condemned | 31451 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | COND | ||
22/04/1950 | Condemned | 31452 | RAM | Ramsgate | COND | ||
06/1950 | Condemned | 31217 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | COND | ||
03/1951 | Condemned | 31443 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | COND |