|
|
Where Repaired | Date Stopped | Days Since Last Stopped | Works Entry | Departure | Class of Repair | Waiting Repair Decision | Waiting Works | On Works | Total Duration | Cost of Repair | Mileage | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brighton Works | 05/01/1955 | n/a | 07/02/1955 | Light Casual Fire damage |
28 days | 28 days | £717.00 | |||||
Brighton Works | 12/02/1955 | 5 days | 25/02/1955 | Light Casual | 1 day | 10 days | 11 days | |||||
Brighton Works | 19/04/1955 | 53 days | 03/05/1955 | Non Classified | 2 days | 10 days | 12 days | |||||
Derby Works | 15/08/1955 | 104 days | 01/09/1955 | Light Casual | 15 days | 15 days | £381.00 | |||||
Derby Works | 17/10/1955 | 46 days | 02/12/1955 | Light Casual | 2 days | 1 day | 37 days | 40 days | £974.00 | |||
Derby Works | 23/05/1956 | 173 days | 11/01/1957 | Heavy General | 1 day | 6 days | 191 days | 198 days | £17,653.00 | |||
Derby Works | 18/02/1957 | 38 days | 19/02/1957 | Non Classified Rectification |
1 day | 1 day | ||||||
Derby Works | 28/02/1957 | 9 days | 06/03/1957 | Non Classified Rectification |
5 days | 5 days | ||||||
Derby Works | 12/08/1957 | 159 days | 12/09/1957 | Heavy Casual Alterations to Housing Roof |
1 day | 26 days | 27 days | £1,072.00 | ||||
Derby Works | 02/01/1958 | 112 days | 13/01/1958 | Light Casual | 9 days | 9 days | £352.00 | |||||
Derby Works | 16/04/1958 | 93 days | 06/05/1958 | Light Casual | 6 days | 16 days | 22 days | £381.00 | ||||
Derby Works | 20/08/1958 | 106 days | 04/11/1958 | Heavy General | 4 days | 61 days | 65 days | £7,050.00 | ||||
Derby Works | 17/12/1958 | 43 days | 19/12/1958 | Light Casual | 1 day | 1 day | 2 days | £152.00 | ||||
Derby Works | 05/01/1959 | 17 days | 09/01/1959 | Non Classified | 4 days | 4 days | ||||||
Derby Works | 22/01/1959 | 13 days | 20/02/1959 | Light Casual | 25 days | 25 days | £750.00 | |||||
Derby Works | 13/05/1959 | 82 days | 28/08/1959 | Light Casual | 5 days | 87 days | 92 days | £2,321.00 | ||||
Derby Works | 19/09/1959 | 22 days | 05/10/1959 | Light Casual | 7 days | 6 days | 13 days | £560.00 | ||||
Derby Works | 13/01/1961 | 466 days | 22/04/1961 | Heavy Casual | 8 days | 6 days | 70 days | 84 days | £7,286.00 | |||
Derby Works | 19/06/1961 | 58 days | 20/07/1961 | Non Classified | 9 days | 18 days | 27 days | £798.00 | ||||
Derby Works | 05/09/1961 | 47 days | 08/12/1961 | Heavy Casual | 1 day | 4 days | 76 days | 81 days | £3,839.00 |
Year | Annual Mileage | Cumulative Mileage | Fuel Oil Utilised | Approximate Miles/Gallon | Classified Wait Repair | Classified Wait Works | Classified On Works | Classified Total (Wkdys) | Running Repairs | Running Repair & Exams Cost | Wkdys Not Required for Service | Wkdys Stored Serviceable | Wkdys Stored Unserviceable | Total Weekdays Unavailable |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1954 | 72,574 | 72,574 | 82,860g | 0.88 | 43 | 20 | 63 | |||||||
1955 | 71,462 | 144,036 | 90,449g | 0.79 | 2 | 2 | 90 | 94 | 37 | 21 | 152 | |||
1956 | 31,682 | 175,718 | 41,025g | 0.77 | 1 | 6 | 181 | 188 | 38 | 1 | 227 | |||
1957 | 110,795 | 286,513 | 1 | 42 | 43 | 45 | 2 | 90 | ||||||
1958 | 69,360 | 355,873 | 88,765g | 0.78 | 11 | 87 | 98 | 61 | 159 | |||||
1959 | 40,226 | 396,099 | 46,875g | 0.86 | 12 | 118 | 130 | 43 | 32 | 205 | ||||
1960 | 64,466 | 460,565 | 87,053g | 0.74 | 59 | 59 | ||||||||
1961 | 11,355 | 471,920 | 9 | 183 | 192 | 19 | 5 | 216 | ||||||
1962 | 6,639 | 478,559 | 67 | 67 |
Start | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1954 | To Service | To service as British Railways number 10203 Built at Brighton Works Allocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
||
07/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Brighton Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 07/02/1955. Stopped on 05/01/1955 Work undertaken: Fire damage |
||
25/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Brighton Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 25/02/1955. Stopped on 12/02/1955 |
||
03/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Brighton Works (Non Classified) - Dep: 03/05/1955. Stopped on 19/04/1955 |
||
13/08/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
01/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 01/09/1955. Stopped on 15/08/1955 |
||
02/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 02/12/1955. Stopped on 17/10/1955 |
||
11/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy General) - Dep: 11/01/1957. Stopped on 23/05/1956 |
||
19/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Non Classified) - Dep: 19/02/1957. Stopped on 18/02/1957 Work undertaken: Rectification |
||
06/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Non Classified) - Dep: 06/03/1957. Stopped on 28/02/1957 Work undertaken: Rectification |
||
12/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Casual) - Dep: 12/09/1957. Stopped on 12/08/1957 Work undertaken: Alterations to Housing Roof |
||
13/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 13/01/1958. Stopped on 02/01/1958 |
||
06/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 06/05/1958. Stopped on 16/04/1958 |
||
04/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy General) - Dep: 04/11/1958. Stopped on 20/08/1958 |
||
19/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 19/12/1958. Stopped on 17/12/1958 |
||
09/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Non Classified) - Dep: 09/01/1959. Stopped on 05/01/1959 |
||
20/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 20/02/1959. Stopped on 22/01/1959 |
||
28/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 28/08/1959. Stopped on 13/05/1959 |
||
05/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 05/10/1959. Stopped on 19/09/1959 |
||
21/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
22/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Casual) - Dep: 22/04/1961. Stopped on 13/01/1961 |
||
20/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Non Classified) - Dep: 20/07/1961. Stopped on 19/06/1961 |
||
08/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Casual) - Dep: 08/12/1961. Stopped on 05/09/1961 |
||
15/10/1962 | To Store | To Store ( at Derby Works) | ||
07/12/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 10203 | ||
03/1968 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |