Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1874 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 29053 Week
» 20109 Month
» 366533 Year
» 3393386 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11109 |
14/02/1953 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2208 |
04/10/1958 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/02/1953 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/02/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11109 Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd. Allocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
25/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
22/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2208 |
|
|
05/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
14/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
28/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
25/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (2B) |
|
|
05/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
17/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
17/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Works (99C) |
|
|
18/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2208 |
|
|
08/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by National Coal Board: Silverwood |
|
|