Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 507 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 507 Week
» 135323 Month
» 337987 Year
» 3364840 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3528 |
27/06/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08413 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1978 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1978 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/06/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
12/1978 |
a |
Air brakes |
|
fA |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/06/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3528 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
16/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C) |
|
|
31/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
28/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
04/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08413 |
|
|
12/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
30/06/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08413 |
|
|
30/04/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Morley Waste Traders: Leeds |
|
|