Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1443 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 1443 Week
» 136259 Month
» 338923 Year
» 3365776 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3914 |
26/11/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08746 |
06/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
26/11/1960 to Polmadie (66A) |
Withdrawn |
31/08/2003 |
Time in Service |
42 yrs, 9 mths , 5 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 01/2004 |
Cut At |
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 07/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
18/09/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/11/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
18/09/1972 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/11/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3914 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
30/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
15/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
29/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
18/09/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holyhead (6J) |
|
|
06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08746 |
|
|
31/08/2003 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08746 |
|
|
01/2004 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|