08/01/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5243 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
05/12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
10/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
12/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
24/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/02/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25093 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
08/02/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
22/02/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W) |
|
|
09/08/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Scottish Region (91X) |
|
|
25/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
15/11/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (IS) |
|
|
29/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
24/07/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (IS) |
|
|
04/09/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
11/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
07/11/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25093 |
|
|
29/02/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|