Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 267 Today
» 5422 Yesterday
» 21301 Week
» 119946 Month
» 322610 Year
» 3349463 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5848 |
05/07/1962 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31314 |
05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with half yellow panels and white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
05/07/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
02/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/1965 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
02/05/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/07/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
02/05/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/07/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5848 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with half yellow panels and white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
02/1965 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
01/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Leicester Division (D15) |
|
|
22/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
25/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
16/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
19/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/05/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
07/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
03/04/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31314 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
19/09/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31314 |
|
|
02/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|